EP2751268 - METHOD FOR THE ISOLATION OF GENOMIC DNA, RNA, PROTEINS AND METABOLITES FROM A SINGLE BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/28] | METHOD AND KIT FOR THE ISOLATION OF GENOMIC DNA, RNA, PROTEINS AND METABOLITES FROM A SINGLE BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE | ||
[2015/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université du Luxembourg 162 A, Avenue de la Faïencerie 1511 Luxembourg / LU | For all designated states Luxembourg Institute of Science and Technology (LIST) 5, avenue des Hauts-Fourneaux 4362 Esch-sur-Alzette / LU | [2016/08] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states Université du Luxembourg 162 A, Avenue de la Faïencerie 1511 Luxembourg / LU | ||
For all designated states Centre de Recherche Public - Gabriel Lippmann 41, rue du Brill 4422 Belvaux / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILMES, Paul 24 rue du Stade J.F. Kennedy 3502 Dudelange / LU | 02 /
ROUME, Hugo 154 route d'Esch 1471 Luxembourg / LU | 03 /
HILLER, Karsten Birkenweg 6 66663 Besseringen / DE | 04 /
CORDES, Thekla 30 rue Glesener 1630 Luxembourg / LU | [2016/14] |
Former [2014/28] | 01 /
WILMES, Paul 24 rue du Stade J.F. Kennedy L-3502 Dudelange / LU | ||
02 /
ROUME, Hugo 154 route d'Esch L-1471 Luxembourg / LU | |||
03 /
HILLER, Karsten Birkenweg 6 66663 Besseringen / DE | |||
04 /
CORDES, Thekla 30 rue Glesener L-1630 Luxembourg / LU | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 12745471.8 | 02.08.2012 | [2016/14] | WO2012EP65178 | Priority number, date | LU20110091864 | 02.09.2011 Original published format: LU 91864 | [2014/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013029919 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2751268 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2751268 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C12Q1/68, G01N33/68, C12N1/06 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
C12N1/066 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6806 (US);
C12N15/1003 (EP,US);
C12N15/101 (EP,US);
G01N33/6803 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/28] | C12N15/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON GENOMISCHER DNA, RNA, PROTEINEN UND METABOLITEN AUS EINER BIOLOGISCHEN PROBE | [2015/34] | English: | METHOD FOR THE ISOLATION OF GENOMIC DNA, RNA, PROTEINS AND METABOLITES FROM A SINGLE BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE | [2015/34] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR ISOLER L'ADN, L'ARN, LES PROTÉINES GÉNOMIQUES ET LES MÉTABOLITES D'UN SEUL ÉCHANTILLON BIOLOGIQUE | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/28] | VERFAHREN UND KIT ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON GENOMISCHER DNA, RNA, PROTEINEN UND METABOLITEN AUS EINER BIOLOGISCHEN PROBE | ||
Former [2014/28] | METHOD AND KIT FOR THE ISOLATION OF GENOMIC DNA, RNA, PROTEINS AND METABOLITES FROM A SINGLE BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE | ||
Former [2014/28] | MÉTHODE ET KIT POUR ISOLER L'ADN, L'ARN, LES PROTÉINES GÉNOMIQUES ET LES MÉTABOLITES D'UN SEUL ÉCHANTILLON BIOLOGIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 13.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2012 | AL | 06.04.2016 | AT | 06.04.2016 | BE | 06.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | CZ | 06.04.2016 | DK | 06.04.2016 | EE | 06.04.2016 | ES | 06.04.2016 | FI | 06.04.2016 | HR | 06.04.2016 | IT | 06.04.2016 | LT | 06.04.2016 | LV | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | MK | 06.04.2016 | NL | 06.04.2016 | PL | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | RS | 06.04.2016 | SE | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SK | 06.04.2016 | SM | 06.04.2016 | TR | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.07.2016 | GR | 07.07.2016 | GB | 02.08.2016 | IE | 02.08.2016 | LU | 02.08.2016 | IS | 06.08.2016 | PT | 08.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | FR | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 02.08.2012 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
TR | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
GB | 02.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.08.2016 | ||
LU | 02.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 02.08.2012 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
GB | 02.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.08.2016 | ||
LU | 02.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 02.08.2012 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
GB | 02.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.08.2016 | ||
LU | 02.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.08.2012 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
GB | 02.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.08.2016 | ||
LU | 02.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
GB | 02.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.08.2016 | ||
LU | 02.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 06.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004224344 (HAN XIAOLIANG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [YDA] - WOLFRAM WECKWERTH ET AL, "Process for the integrated extraction, identification and quantification of metabolites, proteins and RNA to reveal their co-regulation in biochemical networks", PROTEOMICS, (20040101), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1002/pmic.200200500, ISSN 1615-9853, pages 78 - 83, XP055013545 [YD] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pmic.200200500 | [YA] - Norgen Biotek Corp., "All-in-One Purification Kit Product #24200", (2008), pages 1 - 26, URL: http://www.norgenbiotek.com/product_resources/allinone_purification_kit_total_rna_microrna_total_proteins_and_genomic_dna_allinone_purification_kit__protocol_24200_110.pdf, (20111201), XP002664869 [Y] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14 | [YDA] - GROSS, "Tissue fractionation by hydrostatic pressure cycling technology: the unified sample preparation technique for systems biology studies", JOURNAL OF BIOMOLECULAR TECHNIQUES, (20080101), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 1524-0215, page 189, XP055013562 [YD] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14 | [A] - SOROTH CHEY ET AL, "Improved method for simultaneous isolation of proteins and nucleic acids", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (20110401), vol. 411, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.ab.2010.11.020, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 164 - 166, XP055013548 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2010.11.020 | [A] - SHIBKO S ET AL, "A method for sequential quantitative separation and determination of protein, RNA, DNA, lipid, and glycogen from a single rat liver homogenate or from a subcellular fraction", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, vol. 19, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0003-2697(67)90242-4, ISSN 0003-2697, (19670601), pages 514 - 528, (19670601), XP024827657 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(67)90242-4 | by applicant | US2005106604 | US7488579 | WO2009070558 | - HUMMON AB; LIM SR; DIFILIPPANTONIO MJ; RIED T., "Isolation and solubilization of proteins after TRlzol extraction of RNA and DNA from patient material following prolonged storage", BIOTECHNIQUES, (2007), vol. 4, pages 467 - 70,472 | - CHEY S; CLAUS C; LIEBERT UG, "Improved method for simultaneous isolation of proteins and nucleic acids", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 1, pages 164 - 166 | - XIONG J; YANG Q; KANG J; SUN Y; ZHANG T; MARGARET G ET AL., "Simultaneous isolation of DNA, RNA, and protein from Medicago truncatula L.", ELECTROPHORESIS, (2011), vol. 2, pages 321 - 330 | - WECKWERTH W; WENZEL K; FIEHN O., "Process for the integrated extraction, identification and quantification of metabolites, proteins and RNA to reveal their co-regulation in biochemical networks", PROTEOMICS, (2004), vol. 1, pages 78 - 83 | - MORSE SM; SHAW G; LARNER SF., "Concurrent mRNA and protein extraction from the same experimental sample using a commercially available column-based RNA preparation kit", BIOTECHNIQUES, (2006), vol. 1, page 54,56,58 | - TOLOSA JM; SCHJENKEN JE; CIVITI TD; CLIFTON VL; SMITH R, "Column-based method to simultaneously extract DNA, RNA, and proteins from the same sample", BIOTECHNIQUES, (2007), vol. 6, pages 799 - 804 | - GROSS V; CARLSON G; KWAN AT; SMEJKAL G; FREEMAN E; IVANOV AR ET AL., "Tissue fractionation by hydrostatic pressure cycling technology: the unified sample preparation technique for systems biology studies", J BIOMOL TECH, (2008), vol. 3, pages 189 - 199 | - CHOMCZYNSKI, P, "A reagent for the single-step simultaneous isolation of RNA, DNA and proteins from cell and tissue samples", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1993), vol. 15, pages 532 - 36,236 | - WILMES P.; BOND PL., "The application of two-dimensional polyacrylamide gel electrophoresis and downstream analyses to a mixed community of prokaryotic microorganisms", ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 9, pages 911 - 920 |