EP2736751 - LIQUID CONTAINER FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR A FUEL CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kautex Textron GmbH & Co. KG Kautexstrasse 52 53229 Bonn / DE | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOUKAN, Ibrahim Helene-Wessel-Strasse 20 50999 Köln / DE | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Richly & Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 100411 51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Kierdorf Ritschel Sattlerweg 14 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 12745774.5 | 25.07.2012 | WO2012EP03139 | Priority number, date | DE201110108333 | 25.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011108333 | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013013818 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2736751 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2736751 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/035 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
B60K15/035 (EP,RU,US);
B60K15/03504 (US);
B60K2015/03514 (US);
B60K2015/03566 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG, INSBESONDERE EIN KRAFTSTOFFBEHÄLTER | [2014/23] | English: | LIQUID CONTAINER FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR A FUEL CONTAINER | [2014/23] | French: | CONTENEUR DE LIQUIDE POUR VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE, EN PARTICULIER CONTENEUR DE CARBURANT | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 30.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2012 | AL | 22.07.2015 | AT | 22.07.2015 | BE | 22.07.2015 | BG | 22.07.2015 | CY | 22.07.2015 | CZ | 22.07.2015 | DK | 22.07.2015 | EE | 22.07.2015 | ES | 22.07.2015 | FI | 22.07.2015 | HR | 22.07.2015 | IT | 22.07.2015 | LT | 22.07.2015 | LV | 22.07.2015 | MC | 22.07.2015 | MK | 22.07.2015 | MT | 22.07.2015 | NL | 22.07.2015 | PL | 22.07.2015 | RO | 22.07.2015 | RS | 22.07.2015 | SE | 22.07.2015 | SI | 22.07.2015 | SK | 22.07.2015 | SM | 22.07.2015 | TR | 22.07.2015 | IE | 25.07.2015 | LU | 25.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | NO | 22.10.2015 | GR | 23.10.2015 | IS | 22.11.2015 | PT | 23.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.07.2012 | |
AT | 22.07.2015 | ||
BE | 22.07.2015 | ||
BG | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MK | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
NL | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
TR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 25.07.2015 | ||
LU | 25.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 25.07.2012 | |
AT | 22.07.2015 | ||
BE | 22.07.2015 | ||
BG | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
NL | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 25.07.2015 | ||
LU | 25.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.07.2012 | |
AT | 22.07.2015 | ||
BE | 22.07.2015 | ||
BG | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
NL | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 25.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
BE | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 25.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
BE | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 25.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 25.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IE | 25.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 22.07.2015 | |
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 22.07.2015 | |
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 22.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0206874 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-6,8 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2188913 (ITALIANA SERRATURE TORINO) [A] 4* abstract *; | [X]FR2692207 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2728200 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19524254 (MC MICRO COMPACT CAR AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * the whole document * |