EP2734382 - DATA CARRIER WITH TACTILE SECURITY FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | [2017/34] |
Former [2014/22] | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANG, Thomas Adolf-Kolping-Strasse 46 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 02 /
SCHIFFMANN, Peter Fehwiesenstr. 57 81673 München / DE | [2014/25] |
Former [2014/22] | 01 /
MANG, Thomas Adolf-Kolping-Strasse 46 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | ||
02 /
SCHIFFMANN, Peter Angerstrasse 12a 85354 Freising / DE | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 12746020.2 | 19.07.2012 | [2016/01] | WO2012EP03060 | Priority number, date | DE201110108239 | 21.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011108239 | [2014/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013010673 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2734382 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2734382 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2734382 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/00 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
B42D25/29 (EP);
B42D25/324 (EP);
B42D25/355 (EP);
B42D25/41 (EP);
B42D25/425 (EP);
B42D25/45 (EP);
B42D25/47 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/22] | B42D15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/22] | Title | German: | DATENTRÄGER MIT TAKTILEM SICHERHEITSMERKMAL | [2014/22] | English: | DATA CARRIER WITH TACTILE SECURITY FEATURE | [2014/22] | French: | SUPPORT DE DONNÉES AVEC CARACTÉRISTIQUE DE SÉCURITÉ TACTILE | [2014/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/22] | 13.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.10.2016 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.2016
11.10.2016
ADMISSIBLE Oberthur Fiduciaire SAS 7 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Regimbeau Parc d'affaires Cap Nord A 2, allée Marie Berhaut CS 71104 35011 Rennes Cedex / FR | [2018/41] |
Former [2016/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.2016
Oberthur Fiduciaire SAS 7 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Regimbeau Parc d'affaires Cap Nord A 2, allée Marie Berhaut CS 71104 35011 Rennes Cedex / FR | 10.11.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.03.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.01.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.01.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.04.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.08.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 04.03.2019 | Appeal received No. T0681/19 | 01.04.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2012 | AL | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | RS | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | SM | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | IE | 19.07.2016 | LU | 19.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | AT | 19.07.2017 | SE | 20.07.2020 | NL | 01.08.2020 | [2021/24] |
Former [2021/21] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
AL | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2018/50] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
AL | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
AL | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/45] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0149542 (BRADBURY WILKINSON CHEQUES [GB]) [A] 5* page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 6 *; | [Y]CA2263616 (CANADIAN BANK NOTE CO LTD [CA]) [Y] 1-19 * page 4 - page 7; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102009053706 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0010]; figure 3 * | Opposition | CA2263616 | DE102009053706 | EP0149542 | US2006127649 | FR2255183 | US2003145747 | US2007298205 | US6145468 | - HELMUT KIPPHAN, Handbook of Print Media Technologien und Produktionsverfahren, Berlin, Heidelberg, New York, Springer Verlag, (20000000), pages 2pp, 49-53, 373 - 378, ISBN 3-540-66941-8, XP055638356 | - Hubert R. Dinse, "Haptic backnote design", Hubert R. Dinse, MARTIN GRUNWALD, Human Haptic Perception Basics and Applications, Basel-Boston-Berlin, Birkhäuser Verlag,, (20080000), pages 2pp, 537 - 541, ISBN 978-3-7643-76-11-6, XP055638359 | - Hans de Heij, "Banknotes design for the visually impaired", DNB Occasional Studies, vol. 7, no. 2, (2009), pages 5 - 167, URL: https://www.dnb.nl/binaries/Banknote%20design%20for%20the%20visually%20impaired_tcm46-224150.pdf, XP055638360 |