EP2751211 - PAPER COATING COMPOSITIONS FOR GREASE AND WATER RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Dawei 4052 D Langston Place Sylvania, OH 43560 / US | [2014/28] | Representative(s) | Mieskes, Klaus Theoderich, et al Wacker Chemie AG Gisela-Stein-Straße 1 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Mieskes, Klaus Theoderich, et al Wacker Chemie AG Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12746105.1 | 14.08.2012 | WO2012EP65901 | Priority number, date | US201113222299 | 31.08.2011 Original published format: US201113222299 | [2014/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013029992 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2751211 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09D131/04, C09D183/14, D21H19/32, D21H19/58, D21H21/16, C09D183/04 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
D21H21/16 (EP,US);
C09D123/0853 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
D21H19/32 (EP,US);
D21H19/58 (EP,US);
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D123/0853, C08L83/04 (US,EP);
C09D131/04, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C09D183/04, C08L83/00, C08L31/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Title | German: | PAPIERBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR FETT- UND WASSERBESTÄNDIGKEIT | [2014/28] | English: | PAPER COATING COMPOSITIONS FOR GREASE AND WATER RESISTANCE | [2014/28] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR COUCHAGE DU PAPIER CONFÉRANT UNE RÉSISTANCE À LA GRAISSE ET À L'EAU | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 31.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011002695 (DOW CORNING [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * columns 2-4; claims 1-15 *; | [A]US2007032596 (YAMAMOTO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0011] - [0018] - [0040] , [0061] - [0078]; claims 1-10 *; | [A]US6818685 (CHAPMAN DAVID MONROE [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 11 - line 61 * * column 4, line 10 - line 65; claims 1-21 *; | [A]US2007092718 (MURPHY CHRISTOPHER B [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0028]; claims 1-55 * | by applicant | US6764717 | US6956096 | US7135513 | US7153912 | US7238755 | US3775452 | US3715334 | US6054523 | - COMPREHENSIVE HANDBOOK OF HYDROSILYLATION, PERGAMON PRESS |