EP2676215 - LEARNING TO PREDICT EFFECTS OF COMPOUNDS ON TARGETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carnegie Mellon University 5000 Forbes Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15213 / US | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAIK, Armaghan W. 5546 Beacon St. Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15217 / US | 02 /
KANGAS, Joshua D. 317 Idlewood Road Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15235 / US | 03 /
LANGMEAD, Christopher J. 110 Golf Ridge Dr Monroeville, Pennsylvania 15146-1141 / US | 04 /
MURPHY, Robert F. 2537 Clubhouse Dr Wexford, Pennsylvania 15090 / US | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Conroy, John, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Coehn, Markus Fish & Richardson P.C. High Light Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12746456.8 | 14.02.2012 | WO2012US25029 | Priority number, date | US201161463206P | 14.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161463206 P | US201161463589P | 18.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161463589 P | US201161463593P | 18.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161463593 P | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012112534 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2676215 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G06F17/30, // G06F19/24 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
G16C20/70 (EP,US);
G01N33/48 (EP,US);
G16B40/20 (US);
G16B40/30 (EP);
G16C20/30 (EP,US);
G16B40/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/52] | G06F19/00, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Title | German: | LERNEN DER VORHERSAGE DER AUSWIRKUNGEN VON STOFFEN AUF ZIELE | [2013/52] | English: | LEARNING TO PREDICT EFFECTS OF COMPOUNDS ON TARGETS | [2013/52] | French: | APPRENTISSAGE DE LA PRÉDICTION DES EFFETS DE COMPOSÉS SUR DES CIBLES | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02093297 (TRANSFORM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular: * * page 11, line 35 - page 12, line 9 * * page 26, lines 16-19 * * page 34, lines 28-33 * * page 51, line 31 - page 52, line 1 * * figures 1-4 *; | [I]US2005197986 (SCHUPPERT ANDREAS [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * claims 22-43 *; | [XI] - WARMUTH M. K. ET AL, "Active Learning with Support Vector Machines in the Drug Discovery Process", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL INFORMATION AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, COLOMBUS, OHIO, US, (20030212), vol. 43, no. 1, doi:10.1021/CI025620T, ISSN 0095-2338, pages 667 - 673, XP002394233 [X] 1-3,7-13 * abstract * * page 667, column r, lines 8-16 * * figures 1,2 * * page 669, column r, line 21 - page 671, column l, line 3 * [I] 4-6,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ci025620t | [I] - VAN WESTEN G. J. P. ET AL, "Proteochemometric modeling as a tool to design selective compounds and for extrapolating to novel targets", MEDCHEMCOMM, United Kingdom, (20101101), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:10.1039/C0MD00165A, ISSN 2040-2503, pages 16 - 30, XP055435797 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C0MD00165A | [I] - CAWSE J. N., "EXPERIMENTAL STRATEGIES FOR COMBINATORIAL AND HIGH-THROUGHPUT MATERIALS DEVELOPMENT", ACCOUNTS OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20010320), vol. 34, no. 3, doi:10.1021/AR000117S, ISSN 0001-4842, pages 213 - 221, XP001051089 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ar000117s | [I] - VAN RIEL N. A. W., "Dynamic modelling and analysis of biochemical networks: mechanism-based models and model-based experiments", BRIEFINGS IN BIOINFORMATICS, (20060926), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.1093/bib/bbl040, ISSN 1467-5463, pages 364 - 374, XP055104245 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bib/bbl040 | [I] - OPREA T. I. ET AL, "Chemical information management in drug discovery: Optimizing the computational and combinatorial chemistry interfaces", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR GRAPHICS AND MODEL, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20000801), vol. 18, no. 4-5, doi:10.1016/S1093-3263(00)00066-8, ISSN 1093-3263, pages 512 - 524, XP004801429 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1093-3263(00)00066-8 | International search | [A]WO0214562 (DOFASCO INC [CA]); | [Y]US2004040001 (MILLER MICHAEL L [US], et al); | [A]US2004230545 (LITTLEFIELD TIMOTHY R [US], et al); | [Y]US7505886 (ALVAREZ GUILLERMO [US], et al) |