EP2677199 - TOROIDAL TYPE CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Kota c/o NSK Ltd. 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | 02 /
KISHIDA, Hirotaka c/o NSK Ltd. 5-50, Kugenumashinmei 1-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8501 / JP | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12746713.2 | 10.02.2012 | WO2012JP53139 | Priority number, date | JP20110031822 | 17.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011031822 | [2013/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012111562 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2677199 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/38 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
F16H15/38 (EP,US);
F16H2015/383 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Title | German: | STUFENLOSES TORSIONSGETRIEBE | [2013/52] | English: | TOROIDAL TYPE CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION | [2013/52] | French: | TRANSMISSION À VARIATION CONTINUE DU TYPE TOROÏDALE | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2012 | Translation filed | 29.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 25.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS587958U (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO., LTD.); | [Y]JP2001158400 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2002500325 (TOROTRAK (DEVELOPMENT) LTD.); | [Y]JP2002195365 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2004162851 (NSK LTD) | by applicant | JPH11210869 |