EP2677751 - VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND VIDEO DECODING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [2021/13] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York NY 10017 / US | ||
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue Suite 200 Torrance CA 90503 / US | ||
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAHADANIAH, Viktor c/o Panasonic Singapore Laboratory BLK 1022 Tai Seng Avenue no.06-3530 Tai Seng Industrial Estate Singapore 534415 / SG | 02 /
LIM, Chong Soon c/o Panasonic Singapore Laboratory BLK 1022 Tai Seng Avenue no.06-3530 Tai Seng Industrial Estate Singapore 534415 / SG | 03 /
NAING, Sue Mon Thet c/o Panasonic Singapore Laboratory BLK 1022 Tai Seng Avenue no.06-3530 Tai Seng Industrial Estate Singapore 534415 / SG | 04 /
NISHI, Takahiro c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
SHIBAHARA, Youji c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
SASAI, Hisao c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
SUGIO, Toshiyasu c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/13] |
Former [2013/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12747108.4 | 16.02.2012 | [2021/13] | WO2012JP01013 | Priority number, date | US201161443373P | 16.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161443373 P | [2013/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012111331 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2677751 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2677751 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/31, H04N19/70 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
H04N19/573 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/31 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (KR);
H04N19/159 (KR,US);
H04N19/172 (KR,US);
H04N19/423 (KR);
H04N19/503 (KR);
H04N19/593 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/52] | H04N7/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIDEOCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND VIDEODECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2013/52] | English: | VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND VIDEO DECODING METHOD | [2013/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE VIDÉO ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE VIDÉO | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2013 | Translation filed | 05.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 27.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2012 | AL | 31.03.2021 | AT | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | MK | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SE | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | TR | 31.03.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.02.2012 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 16.02.2012 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.02.2012 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
NO | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1809042 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] ** figure 1 *; | [X] - JILL BOYCE ET AL, "High layer syntax to improve support for temporal scalability", 4. JCT-VC MEETING; 95. MPEG MEETING; 20-1-2011 - 28-1-2011; DAEGU;(JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110115), no. JCTVC-D200, ISSN 0000-0013, XP030008240 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2007042916 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [X]WO2008048886 (VIDYO INC [US], et al); | [X] - BOYCE ET AL., "High layer syntax to improve support for temporal scalability", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT-VC) OF ITU-T SG16 WP3 AND ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11, JCTVC-D200, 4TH MEETING, DAEGU, KR, (201101), pages 1 - 14, XP030008240 | [A] - HEIKO SCHWARZ ET AL., "Hierarchical B pictures", JOINT VIDEO TEAM (JVT) OF ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG (ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q.6), JVT-P014, 16TH MEETING, POZNAN, PL, pages 1 - 31, XP030006056 |