EP2675334 - STEAM CLEANER INCLUDING A QUICK RELEASE COUPLING FOR A CLEANING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techtronic Floor Care Technology Limited P.O. Box 957 Offshore Incorporations Centre Road Town Tortola / VG | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARLTON, Christopher, M. 4453 Lakeview Glen Dr. Medina, OH 44256 / US | 02 /
KETTAVONG, Phonesacksith, G. 786 Chauncey Lane Kent, OH 44240 / US | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Freischem & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Salierring 47-53 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Patentanwälte Freischem Salierring 47-53 50677 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12747664.6 | 16.02.2012 | WO2012US25428 | Priority number, date | US201161449878P | 07.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161449878 P | US201161443444P | 16.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161443444 P | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012112766 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2675334 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/34, A47L11/40 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
A47L13/16 (EP,US);
A47L11/4036 (EP,US);
A47L11/4083 (EP,US);
A47L11/4086 (EP,US);
F16L37/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Title | German: | DAMPFREINIGER MIT EINER SCHNELLTRENNKUPPLUNG FÜR EIN REINIGUNGSWERKZEUG | [2013/52] | English: | STEAM CLEANER INCLUDING A QUICK RELEASE COUPLING FOR A CLEANING TOOL | [2013/52] | French: | APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE À LA VAPEUR COMPRENANT UN RACCORD RAPIDE POUR UN OUTIL DE NETTOYAGE | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 20.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 03.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2130565 (STORZ KARL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-15* column 67 - column 96; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2010098852 (EURO PRO OPERATING LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 6, line 16 - page 12, line 17; figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]US2002144374 (TSEN SAMSON [TW]); | [A]US2004111822 (SYU WEN-CAI [TW]); | [A]KR100838153B (HOME POWER CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2010269287 (VRDOLJAK OGNJEN [CA], et al) |