EP2676366 - NOVEL MICROMECHANICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy Vuorimiehentie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | For all designated states Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy Vuorimiehentie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states Teknologian Tutki Muskeskus VTT. Vuorimiehentie 3 02044 Vtt / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENSALA, Tuomas VTT P.O. Box 1000 FI-02044 VTT / FI | 02 /
JAAKKOLA, Antti VTT P.O. Box 1000 FI-02044 VTT / FI | 03 /
GANCHENKOVA, Maria Aalto University School of Science and Technology PL 11100 FI-AALTO 00076 / FI | 04 /
PRUNNILA, Mika VTT P.O. Box 1000 FI-02044 VTT / FI | 05 /
KIIHAMÄKI, Jyrki VTT P.O. Box 1000 FI-02044 VTT / FI | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2020/49] |
Former [2014/41] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/52] | Luoto, Kristian Reinhold Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 12747759.4 | 17.02.2012 | [2020/49] | WO2012FI50157 | Priority number, date | FI20110005151 | 17.02.2011 Original published format: FI 20115151 | US201161443725P | 17.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161443725 P | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012110708 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2676366 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2676366 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 23.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/02, H03H3/007, B81B3/00, // H03H9/24 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
H03H9/02448 (EP,FI,KR,US);
B81B3/0081 (FI);
B81B3/0078 (EP,KR,US);
H03H3/0072 (FI,KR,US);
H03H3/0076 (EP,FI,KR,US);
H03H9/2405 (FI,KR,US);
H03H9/2447 (EP,FI,US);
B81B2201/0271 (EP,US);
H03H2009/02503 (EP,US);
H03H2009/02519 (EP,US);
H03H2009/241 (EP,US);
H03H2009/2442 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | H03H9/02, H03H3/007, B81B3/00, H01L41/18, // H03H9/24 | ||
Former IPC [2014/32] | H03H9/02, H03H3/007, B81B3/00, // H03H9/24 | ||
Former IPC [2013/52] | H03H9/02, H03H3/007, B81B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE MIKROMECHANISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2013/52] | English: | NOVEL MICROMECHANICAL DEVICES | [2013/52] | French: | NOUVEAUX DISPOSITIFS MICROMÉCANIQUES | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 24.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 20.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2012 | AL | 02.12.2020 | AT | 02.12.2020 | CY | 02.12.2020 | CZ | 02.12.2020 | DK | 02.12.2020 | EE | 02.12.2020 | ES | 02.12.2020 | FI | 02.12.2020 | HR | 02.12.2020 | IT | 02.12.2020 | LT | 02.12.2020 | LV | 02.12.2020 | MC | 02.12.2020 | MK | 02.12.2020 | MT | 02.12.2020 | NL | 02.12.2020 | PL | 02.12.2020 | RO | 02.12.2020 | RS | 02.12.2020 | SE | 02.12.2020 | SI | 02.12.2020 | SK | 02.12.2020 | SM | 02.12.2020 | TR | 02.12.2020 | IE | 17.02.2021 | LU | 17.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | BG | 02.03.2021 | NO | 02.03.2021 | GR | 03.03.2021 | IS | 02.04.2021 | PT | 05.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
MK | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
TR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 17.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
MK | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 17.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 17.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 17.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 17.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 17.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 17.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2021 | ||
LU | 17.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 02.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007262831 (VAN BEEK JOZEF THOMAS M [NL], et al); | by applicant | US4358745 | US4719383 | US7145402 | US2010127596 | FI20105849 | FI20105851 | WO2010FI50935 |