EP2729035 - CLEANING SECTION FOR AN ELECTRIC ORAL HYGIENE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRIESEN, Georges Bangert Strasse 21 D-61276 Weilrod / DE | 02 /
THALHEIM-MARTIN, Alex Volta Strasse 77 D-60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
TREBITZ, Bernd Am Grasweg 16 D35510 Butzbach / DE | 04 /
SCHMELCHER, Heidrun Ahomweg 62 D61440 Oberursel / DE | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Stefan Michael Braun GmbH Patent Department Frankfurterstrasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2014/20] | Application number, filing date | 12748053.1 | 05.07.2012 | WO2012IB53455 | Priority number, date | US201161504805P | 06.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161504805 P | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013005190 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2729035 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/02, A61C17/22, A46B15/00 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
A46B9/025 (EP,US);
A46B15/0085 (EP,US);
A61C17/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSABSCHNITT FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE MUNDHYGIENEVORRICHTUNG | [2014/20] | English: | CLEANING SECTION FOR AN ELECTRIC ORAL HYGIENE DEVICE | [2014/20] | French: | SECTION DE NETTOYAGE POUR DISPOSITIF D'HYGIÈNE BUCCALE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 26.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/08] | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2002138926 (BROWN WILLIAM R [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraphs [0041] , [0042]; figures 3,5,6; claim 25 *; | [I]US2006248667 (KRAEMER HANS [DE]) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0093]; figures 15A-15C *; | [I]US2003182743 (GATZEMEYER JOHN J [US], et al) [I] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0032] , [0035]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0164072 (MIJATOVIC MIODRAG [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2008307591 | US4802255 | US6018840 | US6553604 | US2004177462 | US2005235439 | US2005060822 | US2007251040 | US2004154112 | US2006272112 | US6151745 | US6058541 | US5268005 | US5313909 | US5836769 | US5722106 | US6475553 | US2006080794 | US2006010628 | US2005166344 | US2005210612 | US2006195995 | US2008189888 | US2006052806 | US2004255416 | US2005000049 | US2005038461 | US2004134007 | US2006026784 | US2007049956 | US2008244849 | US2005000043 | US2007140959 | US5980542 | US6402768 | US6102923 |