EP2748448 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING MISFIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wärtsilä Finland Oy Tarhaajantie 2 65380 Vaasa / FI | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÖSTMAN, Fredrik Koulukatu 32 A 4 FI-65100 Vaasa / FI | 02 /
PORTIN, Kaj Punakivenkatu 7 FI-65300 Vaasa / FI | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2014/27] | Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 Antinkatu 3 C 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 12748241.2 | 23.07.2012 | [2015/47] | WO2012FI50746 | Priority number, date | FI20110005823 | 25.08.2011 Original published format: FI 20115823 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013026950 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2748448 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2748448 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02D35/02, G01M15/11 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
F02D35/02 (EP);
F02P17/04 (FI);
G01M15/11 (EP,FI);
F02D2200/1015 (EP);
F02D41/2422 (EP);
F02D41/2429 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR STEUERUNG VON FEHLZÜNDUNGEN | [2014/27] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING MISFIRE | [2014/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT POUR LE RÉGLAGE D'UN DÉFAUT D'ALLUMAGE | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 18.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2012 | AL | 18.11.2015 | AT | 18.11.2015 | BE | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | DK | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | ES | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | HR | 18.11.2015 | IT | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | MK | 18.11.2015 | NL | 18.11.2015 | PL | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | RS | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | SM | 18.11.2015 | TR | 18.11.2015 | GR | 19.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | PT | 18.03.2016 | GB | 23.07.2016 | IE | 23.07.2016 | LU | 23.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | FR | 01.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 23.07.2012 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 23.07.2016 | ||
IE | 23.07.2016 | ||
LU | 23.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 23.07.2012 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 23.07.2016 | ||
IE | 23.07.2016 | ||
LU | 23.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.07.2012 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 23.07.2016 | ||
IE | 23.07.2016 | ||
LU | 23.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.07.2012 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 23.07.2016 | ||
IE | 23.07.2016 | ||
LU | 23.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 23.07.2016 | ||
IE | 23.07.2016 | ||
LU | 23.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
GB | 23.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6158411 (MORIKAWA KOJI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008264360 (DAGCI OGUZ H [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US7031828 (THOMPSON JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2004076668 |