EP2748279 - USE OF POLYAMINE AS ANTI-STICKING ADDITIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2016 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Str. 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Straße 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egli, Herbert Hauptstrasse 18 CH-5444 Künten / CH | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 12748446.7 | 17.08.2012 | WO2012EP66059 | Priority number, date | EP20110178223 | 22.08.2011 Original published format: EP 11178223 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013026781 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2748279 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09K17/14, C09K17/18 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
C09K17/14 (EP,US);
C09K17/18 (EP,US);
E02D3/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON POLYAMIN ALS HAFTABWEISENDER ZUSATZ | [2014/27] | English: | USE OF POLYAMINE AS ANTI-STICKING ADDITIVE | [2014/27] | French: | UTILISATION DE POLYAMINE EN TANT QU'ADDITIF ANTIADHÉRENT | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 04.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/28] | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1152024 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * paragraphs [0048] , [0060] , [0064] , [0110] * [I] 10; | [XI]JPH11263974 (TAISEI CORP; NMB KK) [X] 1-3,10 * abstract * [I] 8,9; | [A]US5201612 (GADELLE CLAUDE [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-3,8-10 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1184129 (TOYO KOATSU IND INC [JP]) [A] 1-3,8-10 * the whole document * | Examination | US4366071 | US2006289164 | US3250330 | by applicant | - MOORE; MITCHELL, GE- OTECHNIQUE, (1974), vol. 24, pages 627 - 640 |