EP2737607 - SUPERCONDUCTING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2014/23] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRAUENHOFER, Joachim Cuxhavenerstr. 85 90425 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
GRUNDMANN, Jörn Waldstr. 15a 91091 Großenseebach / DE | 03 /
HARTIG, Rainer Dammhauser Str. 12 21614 Buxtehude / DE | 04 /
KUMMETH, Peter Langenzenner Str. 19 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 05 /
VAN HASSELT, Peter Tennenloher Str. 40 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2014/23] | Application number, filing date | 12748686.8 | 17.08.2012 | [2019/39] | WO2012EP66083 | Priority number, date | DE20111082365 | 08.09.2011 Original published format: DE102011082365 | [2014/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013034419 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2737607 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2737607 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02K55/02, H02P9/00, H02K9/24, H02K3/28, H02K55/04 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
H02K3/28 (EP,KR,US);
H02K55/02 (KR);
H02K19/00 (KR);
H02K55/04 (EP,US);
H02K9/24 (EP,KR,US);
H02P9/02 (US);
H02P9/14 (US);
H02K2213/06 (EP,US);
H02K2213/09 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/23] | H02K/ | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUPRALEITENDE MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETRIEB | [2014/23] | English: | SUPERCONDUCTING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF | [2014/23] | French: | MACHINE SUPRACONDUCTRICE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 15.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2012 | AL | 25.09.2019 | CY | 25.09.2019 | CZ | 25.09.2019 | DK | 25.09.2019 | EE | 25.09.2019 | FI | 25.09.2019 | HR | 25.09.2019 | IT | 25.09.2019 | LT | 25.09.2019 | LV | 25.09.2019 | MC | 25.09.2019 | MK | 25.09.2019 | MT | 25.09.2019 | PL | 25.09.2019 | RO | 25.09.2019 | RS | 25.09.2019 | SI | 25.09.2019 | SK | 25.09.2019 | SM | 25.09.2019 | BG | 25.12.2019 | NO | 25.12.2019 | GR | 26.12.2019 | IS | 26.01.2020 | PT | 27.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 17.08.2012 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.08.2012 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 25.09.2019 | |
NO | 25.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3743875 (SMITH J, et al) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 45-51; figures 1,2-4-8 * * column 3, lines 66,67 * * column 11, lines 1-9 * [Y] 2-10; | [Y]US4200817 (BRATOLJIC TIHOMIR [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, lines 18-26 *; | [Y]US4464617 (YANTOVSKY LEONID I [SU], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, lines 43-49; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0228012 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, lines 13-23; figures 1-3,13 * * column 5, lines 32-34 *; | [Y]DE19931010 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, lines 19-16; figures 1-3 ** column 3, lines 31-35 *; | [Y]US7453174 (KALSI SWARN S [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, lines 30-40 * * column 3, lines 19-21 * * column 5, lines 22-25,45-57 * | Examination | GB834952 | US2010283318 |