EP2679300 - LIQUID PHASE LASER ABLATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nara Machinery Co., Ltd. 5-7, Jonan-jima 2-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-0002 / JP | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGARE, Sanshiro c/o Nara Machinery Co., Ltd. 5-7, Jonanjima 2-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-0002 / JP | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12748971.4 | 13.02.2012 | WO2012JP53285 | Priority number, date | JP20110035060 | 21.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011035060 | [2014/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012114923 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2679300 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/12, B23K26/12, B23K26/36 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
B23K26/16 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/122 (KR,US);
B23K26/0622 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/0643 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/0648 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/082 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/1224 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/361 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/362 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGPHASEN-LASERABLATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2014/01] | English: | LIQUID PHASE LASER ABLATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2014/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ABLATION PAR LASER DE PHASE LIQUIDE | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2013 | Translation filed | 31.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 02.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.10.2020 | 15.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/11] | 22.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.10.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002050489 (IKEGAMI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [[0050]] - [[0058]]; figures 2-3 *; | [X]WO02063284 (NORANDA INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 2-3 *; | [X]WO2010087869 (IMRA AMERICA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XP]DE102010055404 (IMRA AMERICA INC [US]) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2011192450 (LIU BING [US], et al) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2011192714 (LIU BING [US], et al) [XP] 1-10* the whole document *; | [XP]WO2011100154 (IMRA AMERICA INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2011100152 (IMRA AMERICA INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH06142971 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND); | [X]JP2002224878 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2007070141 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) | by applicant | JP2004090081 | JP2006122845 |