EP2678660 - LINE SCAN CYTOMETRY SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, CA 94547 / US | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENG, Xin 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, California 94547 / US | 02 /
PATT, Paul 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, California 94547 / US | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12749439.1 | 21.02.2012 | WO2012US25969 | Priority number, date | US201161445227P | 22.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161445227 P | US201213399808 | 17.02.2012 Original published format: US201213399808 | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012115979 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2678660 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/00, G01N15/14 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
G01N15/1459 (EP,US);
G01N15/1434 (EP,US);
G01N2015/144 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/01] | G01N21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Title | German: | ZEILENABTASTUNGS-ZYTOMETRIESYSTEME UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/01] | English: | LINE SCAN CYTOMETRY SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2014/01] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CYTOMÉTRIE À BALAYAGE LINÉAIRE | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 03.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4920275 (ITOH YUJI [JP]) [X] 1,10 * column 2, line 50 - column 5, line 40; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2-5,11; | [XY]US5426499 (KOSAKA TOKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * column 4, line 58 - column 9, line 50; figures 1-11 * [Y] 2-9,12-14; | [X]US5448349 (KOSAKA TOKIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,10 * column 4, line 62 - column 8, line 64; figures 1-11 *; | [Y]US6112003 (BYBEE JERRY L [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,12,13 * column 7, line 42 - column 12, line 49; figures 1-12 *; | [Y]US2009103798 (GOUCH MARTIN PHILIP [GB]) [Y] 8,14* the whole document *; | [Y]US2010238442 (HENG XIN [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,7,9,11,13 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5475487 (MARIELLA JR RAYMOND P [US], et al); | [Y]US6275777 (SHIMIZU KOTARO [JP]); | [Y]US2006221325 (WELLS MARK A [US]); | [Y]US2010238442 (HENG XIN [US], et al); | [Y]US7852538 (KANESAKA TOMOKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2011017915 (CURRY DOUGLAS N [US]) |