EP2678439 - PROCESS FOR THE MECHANICAL OR MECHANO-CHEMICAL PRETREATMENT OF BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teknologian Tutkimuskeskus VTT Vuorimiehentie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMMONEN, Kirsi c/o VTT P.O. Box 1300 FI-33101 Tampere / FI | 02 /
SIVONEN, Eino c/o VTT P.O.Box 1300 FI-33101 Tampere / FI | 03 /
VALTA, Kyösti c/o VTT P.O. Box 1300 FI-33101 Tampere / FI | 04 /
KALLIOINEN, Anne c/o VTT P.O. Box 1000 FI-02044 Vtt / FI | 05 /
SIIKA-AHO, Matti c/o VTT P.O. Box 1000 FI-02044 Vtt / FI | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2014/01] | Wasström, Kathy Mikaela Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 12749853.3 | 23.02.2012 | WO2012FI50187 | Priority number, date | FI20110005186 | 25.02.2011 Original published format: FI 20115186 | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012113990 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2678439 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 30.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/02, C12P7/10, C13K1/02, B30B11/22, D21C1/10 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
B30B11/228 (EP,US);
C08B1/00 (US);
C13K1/02 (EP,US);
D21C9/004 (EP,US);
D21C9/007 (EP,US);
C12P2201/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/01] | C12P19/02, C12P7/10, C13K1/02, B30B11/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MECHANISCHEN ODER MECHANISCH-CHEMISCHEN VORBEHANDLUNG VON BIOMASSE | [2014/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE MECHANICAL OR MECHANO-CHEMICAL PRETREATMENT OF BIOMASS | [2014/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉTRAITEMENT MÉCANIQUE OU MÉCANO-CHIMIQUE D'UNE BIOMASSE | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 21.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 07.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 14.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3711379 (HOELTER HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1-14* figure 1/1; claims 1-5 *; | [ED]WO2012080574 (TEKNOLOGIAN TUTKIMUSKESKUS VTT OY [FI], et al) [ED] 1-11 * claims 1-24 * * figures 1/3-3/3 * | International search | [A]DE371137 (RUDOLF HASE DR); | [A]US5498766 (STUART EARNEST D [US], et al); | [X]WO0237981 (MICHIGAN BIOTECH INST [US], et al); | [X]US2009064569 (KHATER ABHAY KUMAR [IN]); | [X]EP2143554 (AMANDUS KAHL GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A] - LAMSAL ET AL., "Extrusion as a thermo-mechanical pre-treatment for lignocellulosic ethanol.", BIOMASS AND BIOENERGY, (201012), vol. 34, no. 12, pages 1703 - 1710, XP027472086 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biombioe.2010.06.009 |