EP2678220 - BUOYANCY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Archimedes Pty Ltd Level 7 1 William Street Perth, Western Australia 6000 / AU | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYONS, Tim 32 Grove Street Shoalwater, Western Australia 6010 / AU | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2014/01] | Waller, Stephen FRKelly 4 Mount Charles Belfast, Northern Ireland BT7 1NZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12750260.7 | 27.02.2012 | [2017/41] | WO2012AU00192 | Priority number, date | AU20110900642 | 25.02.2011 Original published format: AU 2011900642 | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012113038 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2678220 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2678220 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/00, B64C25/32, B64C25/56 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
B64C25/56 (EP,US);
B64C27/006 (EP,US);
B64C2025/325 (EP,US);
B64D2201/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/43] | B64C25/56, B64C25/00, B64D25/18 | ||
Former IPC [2014/01] | B64C25/26, B64C25/00, B64D25/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2014/01] | English: | BUOYANCY SYSTEM | [2014/01] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FLOTTABILITÉ | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 25.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 08.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2012 | AL | 11.10.2017 | AT | 11.10.2017 | CY | 11.10.2017 | CZ | 11.10.2017 | DK | 11.10.2017 | EE | 11.10.2017 | ES | 11.10.2017 | FI | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | IT | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | MK | 11.10.2017 | NL | 11.10.2017 | PL | 11.10.2017 | PT | 11.10.2017 | RO | 11.10.2017 | RS | 11.10.2017 | SE | 11.10.2017 | SI | 11.10.2017 | SK | 11.10.2017 | SM | 11.10.2017 | TR | 11.10.2017 | BG | 11.01.2018 | NO | 11.01.2018 | GR | 12.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | GB | 27.02.2018 | IE | 27.02.2018 | LU | 27.02.2018 | MT | 27.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | FR | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.02.2012 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CY | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MK | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
GB | 27.02.2018 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
MT | 27.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 27.02.2012 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
GB | 27.02.2018 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
MT | 27.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
GB | 27.02.2018 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
MT | 27.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
GB | 27.02.2018 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
MT | 27.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
GB | 27.02.2018 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 11.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0091660 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [Y] 6 * page 4, line 10 - line 17; figures 3,4 *[A] 1-5,7-22; | [X]US2004226498 (MEARS TONY W [US], et al) [X] 1 * pages 1-4; figure 5 *; | [X]GB2457719 (GKN AEROSPACE SERVICES LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * pages 1-13; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]WO2010065999 (LYONS TIM [AU]) [X] 1-5,7-22 * page 3 - page 25; figures 6,14-15 * [Y] 6 | International search | [X]US1833646 (HATHORN CHARLES E); | [X]US2544794 (BARTRAM KELLEY, et al); | [X]US3273832 (KEEDY EDGAR L) | by applicant | WO2010065999 |