EP2742142 - RECOMBINANT PRODUCTION OF STEVIOL GLYCOSIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evolva SA Duggingerstrasse 23 4153 Reinach / CH | [2020/13] |
Former [2014/25] | For all designated states Evolva SA Duggingerstrasse 23 4153 Reinach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOUGHTON-LARSEN, Jens Jaegersborg Allé 27 A 3 MF. DK-2920 Charlottenlund / DK | 02 /
HICKS, Paula, M. 20161 Stonegate Drive Bend, OR 97702 / US | 03 /
NAESBY, Michael Stadthausgasse 18 CH-4051 Basel / CH | 04 /
OSTERGAARD, Tange, Thomas Horburgstrasse 24 CH-4057 Basel / CH | 05 /
HANSEN, Jorgen Peter Bangs Vej 122 1th DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | 06 /
DALGAARD MIKKELSEN, Michael J.P.E. Hartmann's Alle 3 St DK-2500 Valby / DK | 07 /
HALKJAER, Hansen, Esben Worsaaesvej 20 3. Tv DK-1972 Frederiksberg C / DK | 08 /
SIMON, Ernesto Svaertegade 7 2nd Floor DK-1118 Copenhagen / DK | 09 /
DE ANDRADE PEREIRA TAVARES, Sabina Tellstrasse 66 4053 Basel / CH | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2016/22] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | ||
Former [2014/25] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12750513.9 | 08.08.2012 | [2016/22] | WO2012US50021 | Priority number, date | US201161521084P | 08.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161521084 P | US201161521203P | 08.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161521203 P | US201161521051P | 08.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161521051 P | US201161523487P | 15.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161523487 P | US201161567929P | 07.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161567929 P | US201261603639P | 27.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261603639 P | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013022989 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2742142 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2742142 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2742142 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/06, C12N9/02, C12P19/56, C12N15/63, C12N15/81, C12N15/82, C12N9/10, C12N9/88, C12N9/90, C12P19/44 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
C12N9/0032 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/81 (EP,KR,US);
C12P19/56 (US);
C12N15/63 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/8243 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/0071 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/0073 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/1051 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/1085 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/90 (EP,KR,US);
C12P19/44 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P20/52 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/10] | C12N9/00, C12N9/10, C12N9/90, C12N15/63, C12N15/81, C12N15/82, C12P19/44 | ||
Former IPC [2014/25] | C12N15/82 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTE HERSTELLUNG VON STEVIOLGLYKOSIDEN | [2014/25] | English: | RECOMBINANT PRODUCTION OF STEVIOL GLYCOSIDES | [2014/25] | French: | PRODUCTION PAR RECOMBINAISON DE GLYCOSIDES DE STÉVIOL | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 04.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15193074.0 / EP3009508 | EP20204465.7 / EP3792350 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.02.2017
03.03.2017
ADMISSIBLE Leeming, John Gerard 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB Opponent's representative J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.02.2017
03.03.2017
ADMISSIBLE Leeming, John Gerard 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB Opponent's representative J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2017/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.02.2017
Leeming, John Gerard 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB Opponent's representative Power, David J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | 05.04.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.10.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01) | 17.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2018 | 26.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 12.06.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.10.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.02.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 22.08.2019 | Appeal received No. T2376/19 | 11.10.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2012 | AL | 01.06.2016 | AT | 01.06.2016 | BE | 01.06.2016 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | DK | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | ES | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | IT | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | MK | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | RS | 01.06.2016 | SE | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | SM | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | IE | 08.08.2016 | LU | 08.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 08.08.2012 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 08.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 08.08.2012 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 08.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.08.2012 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 08.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.08.2012 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 08.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 08.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 01.06.2016 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | WO9918224 [ ] (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]); | WO03008540 [ ] (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2004029255 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al); | [A]EP1897951 (CA MINISTER AGRICULTURE & FOOD [CA]); | [AD]US2008271205 (YAMAGUCHI SHINJIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2010297722 (ANTEROLA ALDWIN MACARAIG [US], et al); | [T]WO2011153378 (ABUNDA NUTRITION INC [US], et al); | [T]WO2012075030 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | by applicant | US5204253 | US5306862 | US5460949 | US5538880 | US6013863 | WO0037663 | WO0063400 | WO0112828 | US6215051 | US6329571 | US2004078846 | US2005003474 | US2006014264 | US7183089 | US2007128311 | US7335815 | US2008064063 | US2008271205 | WO2009140394 | WO2011153378 | Opposition | EP1897951 | US2008064063 | US2011092684 |