EP2756220 - SHIPPING METHOD FOR CO2 STORAGE AND IMPORT OF CNG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stamicarbon B.V. Mercator 3 6135 KW Sittard / NL | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TROLLUX, Jacques Francois Andre c/o Mercator 3 NL 6135 KW Sittard / NL | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12750880.2 | 17.08.2012 | WO2012NL50576 | Priority number, date | EP20110177950 | 18.08.2011 Original published format: EP 11177950 | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013025108 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2756220 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/08, F17C5/06, F17C7/02, F17C7/00 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
F17C5/06 (EP,US);
B63B25/14 (US);
B63B27/24 (US);
F17C1/002 (US);
F17C13/082 (EP,US);
F17C7/00 (EP,US);
F17C7/02 (EP,US);
F17C2221/013 (EP,US);
F17C2221/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0115 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/035 (EP,US);
F17C2260/02 (EP,US);
F17C2260/04 (EP,US);
F17C2265/06 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0105 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0155 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Title | German: | TRANSPORTVERFAHREN FÜR CO2-LAGERUNG UND IMPORT VON KOMPRIMIERTEM ERDGAS | [2014/30] | English: | SHIPPING METHOD FOR CO2 STORAGE AND IMPORT OF CNG | [2014/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSPORT MARITIME POUR LE STOCKAGE DU CO2 ET L'IMPORTATION DE CNG | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 06.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 29.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2005059433 (SARGAS AS [NO], et al) [I] 1-6 * abstract ** pages 1-4,10; figures 1-5 * |