EP2745584 - ANALYSIS AND ADDRESS ALLOCATION OF WIRELESS BUILDING NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tridonic GmbH & Co. KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLLEIS, Edgar Plößlgasse 4/9 A-1040 Wien / AT | 02 /
ZUDRELL-KOCH, Stefan Wasenstraße 10b A-6845 Hohenems / AT | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12751286.1 | 07.08.2012 | [2017/41] | WO2012EP65417 | Priority number, date | DE20111081188 | 18.08.2011 Original published format: DE102011081188 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013023955 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2745584 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2745584 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/26, H04W16/22, H04W24/10, H04W64/00 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
H04W64/003 (EP,US);
H04B17/0085 (US);
H04B17/0087 (US);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04L41/12 (EP,US);
H04L41/145 (EP,US);
H04L43/045 (US);
H04L43/0811 (US);
H04L43/0852 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (US);
H04W16/225 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
H05B47/199 (EP);
H04L2101/622 (US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | H04W64/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYSE UND ADRESSZUWEISUNG VON DRAHTLOSEN GEBÄUDENETZWERKEN | [2017/19] | English: | ANALYSIS AND ADDRESS ALLOCATION OF WIRELESS BUILDING NETWORKS | [2014/26] | French: | ANALYSE ET ATTRIBUTION D'ADRESSE DE RÉSEAUX D'IMMEUBLE SANS FIL | [2014/26] |
Former [2014/26] | ANALYSE UND ADRESSENZUWEISUNG DRAHTLOSER GEBÄUDENETZWERKE | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 03.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2012 | AL | 11.10.2017 | CY | 11.10.2017 | CZ | 11.10.2017 | DK | 11.10.2017 | EE | 11.10.2017 | ES | 11.10.2017 | FI | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | IT | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | MK | 11.10.2017 | NL | 11.10.2017 | PT | 11.10.2017 | RO | 11.10.2017 | RS | 11.10.2017 | SI | 11.10.2017 | SK | 11.10.2017 | SM | 11.10.2017 | TR | 11.10.2017 | BG | 11.01.2018 | NO | 11.01.2018 | GR | 12.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.08.2012 | |
CY | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MK | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 07.08.2012 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 11.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006070113 (BHAGWAT PRAVIN [US], et al) [A] 13,23 * paragraphs [0007] , [0062] , [0084] , [0126] , [0140] *; | [Y]WO2006095316 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 4-9,13,17-20,23,27-29 * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 28 * * page 4, line 11 - page 11, line 3 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US2010329123 (VISWANATHAN HARISH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-12,14-16,21,22,24-26 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0111] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 4-9,13,17-20,23,27-29; | [A] - KYU HYUNG KIM ET AL, "RF-based guard light management system by using Wireless Sensor Network technologies", UBIQUITOUS AND FUTURE NETWORKS (ICUFN), 2011 THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110615), doi:10.1109/ICUFN.2011.5949185, ISBN 978-1-4577-1176-3, pages 327 - 331, XP032003691 [A] 1-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICUFN.2011.5949185 |