Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014149056 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201214233419 | 12.07.2012 | WO2012IB53559 | 12.07.2012 | US201161509224 | 19.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2734849 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB53559 | 12.07.2012 | US201161509224 | 19.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013011425 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161509224 | 19.07.2011 |