EP2751238 - OUD ODORANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes P.O. Box 239 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELORT, Estelle Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes PO Box 239 CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH | 02 /
LIMACHER, Josef Chemin du Bois-de-By 28 CH-1286 Soral / CH | [2015/25] |
Former [2014/28] | 01 /
DELORT, Estelle Firmenich SA 1 route des Jeunes PO Box 239 CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH | ||
02 /
LIMACHER, Josef Chemin du Bois-de-By 28 CH-1286 Soral / CH | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Carina, Riccardo Filippo FIRMENICH SA Legal Dept., IP Group Route des Jeunes, 1 P.O. Box 239 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | Application number, filing date | 12751468.5 | 09.08.2012 | WO2012EP65617 | Priority number, date | EP20110179124 | 29.08.2011 Original published format: EP 11179124 | [2014/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013029958 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2751238 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2751238 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C11B9/00 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
C11B9/0061 (EP,US);
A61K8/347 (EP,US);
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
C11D3/50 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OUD-DUFTSTOFFE | [2014/28] | English: | OUD ODORANTS | [2014/28] | French: | COMPOSÉS ODORANTS D'OUD | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 08.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2016
30.03.2016
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, et al, et al Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2016
30.03.2016
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, et al, et al Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2016/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2016
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 26.04.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.07.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.09.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/11] | 25.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.10.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.08.2012 | AL | 17.06.2015 | AT | 17.06.2015 | BE | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | HR | 17.06.2015 | IT | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | MK | 17.06.2015 | MT | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | RS | 17.06.2015 | SE | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | SM | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | IE | 09.08.2015 | LU | 09.08.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | NO | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 09.08.2015 | ||
LU | 09.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 09.08.2015 | ||
LU | 09.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 09.08.2015 | ||
LU | 09.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 09.08.2015 | ||
LU | 09.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 09.08.2015 | ||
LU | 09.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 09.08.2015 | ||
LU | 09.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 09.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 09.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 09.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 09.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9630470 (QUEST INT [NL], et al) [AD] 1-8 * page 3, line 1 - line 3 *; | [AD] - CZERNY, M.; BUETTNER, A., "Odor-Active Compounds in Cardboard", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 57, pages 9979 - 9984, XP055017479 [AD] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf901435n | [AD] - CULLERE, L. ET AL., "Characterisation of aroma active compounds in black truffles (Tuber melanosporum) and summer truffles (Tuber aestivum) by gas chromatography-olfactometry", FOOD CHEM., (2010), vol. 122, pages 300 - 306, XP026997555 [AD] 1-8 * table 1 * | by applicant | WO9630470 | - M. CZERNY, J. AGRIC. &FOOD CHEM., (2009), vol. 57, page 9979 | - L. CULLERÉ ET AL., FOOD CHEM., (2010), vol. 122, page 300 | - "Hydrokolloide: Stabilisatoren, Dickungs- und Geliermittel in Lebensmitteln", H. SCHERZ, Schriftenreihe Lebensmittelchemie, Lebensmittelqualitat, BEHR'S VERLAG GMBH & CO., (1996), vol. 2 | Opposition | US4595525 | - M. CZERNY et al., "Odor-Active Compounds in Cardboard", Journal of Agricultural and Food Chemistry, (20091111), vol. 57, no. 21, pages 9979 - 9984, XP055017479 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf901435n |