EP2753222 - AUTONOMOUS VACUUM CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMUELS, Benedict c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 02 /
VANDERSTEGEN-DRAKE, Mark c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 03 /
BROWN, Andre c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 04 /
DYSON, James c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Lobban, Colin, et al Dyson Automotive Research and Development Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Lobban, Colin, et al Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | ||
Former [2014/29] | Lobban, Colin, et al Intellectual Property Department Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | Application number, filing date | 12751597.1 | 22.08.2012 | [2016/39] | WO2012GB52057 | Priority number, date | GB20110015602 | 09.09.2011 Original published format: GB 201115602 | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013034882 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2753222 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2753222 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/00 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
A47L9/2889 (EP,US);
A47L9/28 (GB,KR);
A47L9/009 (GB);
A47L9/00 (KR);
B25J13/08 (KR);
B60L1/003 (EP,US);
B60L15/2036 (EP,US);
B60L50/52 (EP,US);
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
G05D1/0227 (GB);
A47L2201/00 (EP,US);
A47L2201/04 (EP,US);
B60L2200/40 (EP,US);
B60L2220/44 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2260/32 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2014/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTSTÄNDIGER STAUBSAUGER | [2016/32] | English: | AUTONOMOUS VACUUM CLEANER | [2014/29] | French: | ASPIRATEUR AUTONOME | [2014/29] |
Former [2014/29] | AUTONOMER STAUBSAUGER | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 20.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15151697.8 / EP2891440 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2012 | AL | 28.09.2016 | AT | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 22.08.2012 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.08.2012 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.08.2012 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.09.2016 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0239868 (DUPLEX CLEANING MACHINES PTY L [AU], et al); | [XA]US2008276407 (SCHNITTMAN MARK [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2008009886 | EP1997418 | US7647144 |