EP2744341 - PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS HAVING DRIED ZINC PYRITHIONE-POLYMER AGGREGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Edward Dewey III 6880 Man-O-War Lane Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 02 /
COOK, Jason Edward 6934 Gammwell Drive Anderson Township, Ohio 45230 / US | 03 /
HAMERSKY, Mark William 5674 Kiowa Court Indian Springs, Ohio 45011 / US | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2014/26] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 12751681.3 | 15.08.2012 | WO2012US50842 | Priority number, date | US201161523816P | 15.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161523816 P | US201161547144P | 14.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161547144 P | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013025745 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2744341 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N55/02, C07F3/06, A01P1/00 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N59/16 (EP,US);
A61K8/0225 (EP,US);
A61K8/0275 (EP,US);
A61K8/27 (EP,US);
A61K8/4933 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/737 (EP,US);
A61K8/8158 (EP,US);
A61K8/817 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/40, A01N25/10, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N59/16, A01N25/10, A01N2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Title | German: | KÖRPERPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT GETROCKNETEN ZINK-PYRITHION-POLYMER-AGGREGATEN | [2014/26] | English: | PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS HAVING DRIED ZINC PYRITHIONE-POLYMER AGGREGATES | [2014/26] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE SOINS PERSONNELS CONTENANT DES AGRÉGATS SÉCHÉS DE PYRITHIONE DE ZINC ET DE POLYMÈRE | [2014/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 15.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/20] | 09.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO0041528 (AMCOL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1 ** examples 1,3 *; | [I]WO0143706 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 13 * * page 14; table 2 *; | [I]WO2005032489 (ARCH CHEM INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1, line 1 - line 11 * * page 3, line 24 - line 33 * * page 4, line 1 - line 22 * * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 4 * * page 7; example 1 * * pages 7-10 * * page 10; table 3 *; | [I]US2006246144 (GAJANAN SHUKLA P [IN], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0029] , [0035] * | Examination | - Ursula Sch?ffling Et Al, "Chapter 8 & 9", Arzneiformenlehre: ein Lehrbuch der Galenik f?r Theorie und Praxis, DE, Dt. Apotheker-verlag, (20090101), pages 187 - 238, ISBN 978-3-7692-4093-1, XP055308388 | by applicant | US2438091 | US2528378 | US2658072 | US2809971 | US5011681 | US5104646 | US5106609 | US6488943 | US6682724 | US8158566 | US20100817786 |