EP2682443 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITION, LAMINATED BODY, AND SOLAR BATTERY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2014/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARUGA, Hiroshi c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
ODA, Koichi c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
MIYAJIMA, Tatsuya c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12751824.9 | 01.03.2012 | WO2012JP55278 | Priority number, date | JP20110046184 | 03.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011046184 | [2014/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012118160 | Date: | 07.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2682443 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09J175/04, B32B27/30, B32B27/40, C09J11/06, H01L31/042 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C09J175/04 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/02168 (US);
B32B27/30 (KR);
B32B27/322 (EP,US);
B32B27/40 (KR);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/44 (EP,US);
C08G18/664 (EP,US);
C08G18/755 (EP,US);
C09J11/06 (KR);
C09J7/22 (EP,US);
C09J7/38 (EP,US);
H01L31/042 (KR);
H01L31/048 (EP,US);
H01L31/049 (EP,US);
B32B2457/12 (EP,US);
C08K5/3435 (EP,US);
C08K5/3492 (EP,US);
C09J2203/322 (EP,US);
C09J2301/408 (EP,US);
C09J2427/006 (EP,US);
C09J2475/00 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2896 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/792 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Title | German: | HAFTMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG, LAMINIERTER KÖRPER UND SOLARBATTERIEMODUL | [2014/02] | English: | ADHESIVE COMPOSITION, LAMINATED BODY, AND SOLAR BATTERY MODULE | [2014/02] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE, CORPS STRATIFIÉ ET MODULE DE BATTERIE SOLAIRE | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2013 | Translation filed | 11.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007148754 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008270647 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH10205056 | JP3530595B | JP3718901B | JP3978912B | JP2008270647 |