EP2681651 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING AN ACTIVE SEARCH USER INTERFACE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/02] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REPONEN, Erika Piia Pauliina Tampellan Esplanadi 6 D 15 FI-33100 Tampere / FI | 02 /
KERÄNEN, Jaakko Olli Taavetti Insinöörinkatu 58 C 9 FI-33720 Tampere / FI | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 12751871.0 | 22.02.2012 | WO2012FI50170 | Priority number, date | US201161447200P | 28.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161447200 P | US201113071270 | 24.03.2011 Original published format: US201113071270 | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012117156 | Date: | 07.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2681651 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 07.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06T17/05, G06T19/00, H04L29/08, G06K9/00, G06F3/0481, G06F17/30 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
G06F3/04815 (EP,US);
G06F16/9537 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/02] | G06F3/048, G06F17/30, G06T17/05, G06T19/00, H04L29/08, A63F13/06, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENELEMENTS FÜR AKTIVE SUCHVORGÄNGE | [2014/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING AN ACTIVE SEARCH USER INTERFACE ELEMENT | [2014/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR FOURNIR UN ÉLÉMENT D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR DE RECHERCHE ACTIVE | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 05.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 25.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004080510 (INOKUCHI AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15* page 11 *; | [I]US2009316951 (SODERSTROM GUSTAV [SE]) [I] 1-15 * page 1 - page 7 * | International search | [Y]US2007162942 (HAMYNEN KIMMO [CH], et al); | [X]WO2007146298 (METACARTA INC [US], et al); | [X]US7610185 (ERSHOV ALEXANDER V [RU]) |