EP2681903 - HANDLING A VOICE COMMUNICATION REQUEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/02] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIDSON, Brian 96 Bishops Wood Goldsworth Park Woking Surrey GU21 3QD / GB | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Sayer, Robert David Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Anderson, Oliver Ben, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12751984.1 | 27.02.2012 | WO2012IB50887 | Priority number, date | US201113036448 | 28.02.2011 Original published format: US201113036448 | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012117329 | Date: | 07.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2681903 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 07.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, H04Q3/00, H04M1/27, H04M1/725 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
H04M1/271 (EP,US);
H04M1/72433 (EP,US);
H04M19/041 (EP,US);
H04M3/42051 (EP,US);
H04M3/42204 (EP,US);
H04M2250/74 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/02] | H04M3/42, H04Q3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Title | German: | HANDHABUNG EINER SPRACHKOMMUNIKATIONSANFRAGE | [2014/02] | English: | HANDLING A VOICE COMMUNICATION REQUEST | [2014/02] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'UNE DEMANDE DE COMMUNICATION VOCALE | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 14.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/23] | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006215827 (PFLEGING GERALD W [US], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [Y]US2008089509 (WUTHNOW MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0053] *; | [Y]US2009204409 (MOZER TODD F [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0094] * | International search | [A]JP2002247144 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]WO2009036602 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [X]US2010159913 (TONG YONGHUI [US], et al) |