|
27.09.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
103 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
103 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
103 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2013 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.12.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2013 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
119 |
|
07.09.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
105 |