Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011028287 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2011 | A3 | WO2011028287 | 10.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9845796 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2017 | B2 | US2015247492 | 03.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213410798 | 02.03.2012 | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US201414310482 | 20.06.2014 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US02428 | 03.09.2010 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8997909 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2015 | B2 | US2014166382 | 19.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201214001937 | 01.03.2012 | WO2012US27311 | 01.03.2012 | US201161448589 | 02.03.2011 | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9528507 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2016 | B2 | US2014161633 | 12.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448583 | 02.03.2011 | WO2012US27320 | 01.03.2012 | US201214001931 | 01.03.2012 | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9551293 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2017 | B2 | US2014090358 | 03.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201214001998 | 02.03.2012 | US201161448610 | 02.03.2011 | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | WO2012US27413 | 02.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9340280 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2016 | B2 | US2014084115 | 27.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448622 | 02.03.2011 | WO2012US27394 | 02.03.2012 | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | US201214001908 | 02.03.2012 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9728699 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2017 | B2 | US2014083670 | 27.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US201161448615 | 02.03.2011 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | US201214001919 | 01.03.2012 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | WO2012US27325 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9192882 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2015 | B2 | US2014083291 | 27.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US201214001930 | 02.03.2012 | US201161448612 | 02.03.2011 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | WO2012US27405 | 02.03.2012 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9404487 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2016 | B2 | US2014076411 | 20.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448620 | 02.03.2011 | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | US201214001907 | 01.03.2012 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | WO2012US27315 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9598247 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2017 | B2 | US2014056654 | 27.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448595 | 02.03.2011 | US201214001946 | 02.03.2012 | WO2012US27398 | 02.03.2012 | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8794930 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2014 | B2 | US2012237364 | 20.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213410798 | 02.03.2012 | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US02428 | 03.09.2010 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9006612 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2015 | B2 | US2011240622 | 06.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US201113039238 | 02.03.2011 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US02428 | 03.09.2010 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140015425 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US27311 | 01.03.2012 | US201161448589 | 02.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140014214 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161448622 | 02.03.2011 | WO2012US27394 | 02.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140010968 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161448583 | 02.03.2011 | WO2012US27320 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101714510B | Global Dossier | 09.03.2017 | B1 | KR20120079833 | 13.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US02428 | 03.09.2010 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6218892B | Global Dossier | 25.10.2017 | B2 | JP2016188646 | 04.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014512294 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US27311 | 01.03.2012 | US201161448589 | 02.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014510230 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161448583 | 02.03.2011 | WO2012US27320 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6038819B | Global Dossier | 07.12.2016 | B2 | JP2014506856 | 20.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161448622 | 02.03.2011 | WO2012US27394 | 02.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013504008 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US02428 | 03.09.2010 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL228168 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161448622 | 02.03.2011 | WO2012US27394 | 02.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL228166 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161448583 | 02.03.2011 | WO2012US27320 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL228165 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US27311 | 01.03.2012 | US201161448589 | 02.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL218425 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US02428 | 03.09.2010 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2681455 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2016 | B1 | EP2681455 | 10.06.2015 | A4 | EP2681455 | 08.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448583 | 02.03.2011 | WO2012US27320 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2681116 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2014 | A4 | EP2681116 | 08.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448622 | 02.03.2011 | WO2012US27394 | 02.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2473785 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2018 | B1 | EP2473785 | 29.04.2015 | A4 | EP2473785 | 11.07.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US02428 | 03.09.2010 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102639940B | Global Dossier | 06.08.2014 | B | CN102639940 | 15.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US02428 | 03.09.2010 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2681088 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2016 | B1 | EP2681088 | 01.07.2015 | A4 | EP2681088 | 08.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US27311 | 01.03.2012 | US201161448589 | 02.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN2800DELNP2012 | 24.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US02428 | 03.09.2010 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2535593 | 20.12.2014 | C2 | RU2012112828 | 10.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US26477809 | 27.11.2009 | US23944609 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US02428 | 03.09.2010 | US29619810 | 19.01.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012119044 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448610 | 02.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012119039 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448612 | 02.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012119034 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2012 | A3 | WO2012119034 | 07.09.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161448595 | 02.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012119031 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448622 | 02.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012118995 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448615 | 02.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012118991 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448583 | 02.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012118990 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448620 | 02.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012118987 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161448589 | 02.03.2011 |