EP2680764 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SEALING ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berens, Eric 6795 E. Calle La Paz 2202 Tucson, Arizona 85715 / US | [2014/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Bernhard, et al Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12752725.7 | 27.02.2012 | WO2012US26777 | Priority number, date | US201161447483P | 28.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161447483 P | [2014/04] |
Former [2014/02] | US201161447483P | 28.02.2011 | |
US201213405911 | 27.02.2012 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012118752 | Date: | 07.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2680764 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/08, A61B17/00, A61B19/00 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B90/92 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00367 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00424 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00623 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00654 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00672 (EP,US);
A61B2090/062 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0811 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/02] | A61B17/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABDICHTUNG EINER PUNKTUR | [2014/02] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SEALING ACCESS | [2014/02] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À FERMER HERMÉTIQUEMENT UN ACCÈS | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 10.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 04.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005049637 (MORRIS EDWARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0067] * | International search | [X]US2006004408 (MORRIS EDWARD J [US], et al); | [Y]US7879061 (KEITH PETER T [US], et al); | [Y]US6719781 (KIM DUCKSOO [US]); | [Y]US6033427 (LEE BENJAMIN I [US]) |