EP2663049 - AUTHENTICATION METHOD BASED ON DHCP, DHCP SERVER AND CLIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/14] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BI, Xiaoyu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Jiajia Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/46] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12753032.7 | 28.02.2012 | [2017/14] | WO2012CN71740 | Priority number, date | CN20111047862 | 28.02.2011 Original published format: CN201110047862 | [2013/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012116633 | Date: | 07.09.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2663049 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2663049 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L9/32, H04L29/12, H04L9/08 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
H04L63/0823 (EP);
H04L61/5014 (EP);
H04L63/0869 (EP);
H04L9/0825 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | H04L29/06, H04L9/32, H04L29/12 | ||
Former IPC [2013/46] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN AUF DHCP-BASIS SOWIE DHCP-SERVER UND -CLIENT | [2013/46] | English: | AUTHENTICATION METHOD BASED ON DHCP, DHCP SERVER AND CLIENT | [2013/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AUTHENTIFICATION DHCP, SERVEUR DHCP ET TERMINAL CLIENT | [2013/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2013 | Translation filed | 08.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 30.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.02.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2012 | AL | 05.04.2017 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.02.2012 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 28.02.2012 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6826690 (HIND JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 12, line 10 - line 27 * * column 13, line 7 - line 33 * * column 15, line 14 - column 19, line 60 *; | [A] - SHENG JIANG HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO ET AL, "Secure DHCPv6 Using CGAs; draft-ietf-dhc-secure-dhcpv6-02.txt", SECURE DHCPV6 USING CGAS; DRAFT-IETF-DHC-SECURE-DHCPV6-02.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20101221), no. 2, pages 1 - 28, XP015073173 [A] 1-19 * page 3, line 1 - page 7, line 37 * * page 17, line 1 - page 19, line 8 * | [A] - SHUE C A ET AL, "A Unified Approach to Intra-domain Security", COMPUTATIONAL SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, 2009. CSE '09. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090829), ISBN 978-1-4244-5334-4, pages 219 - 224, XP031544213 [A] 1-19 * page 219, column r, line 30 - page 222, column r, line 38 * | International search | [A]CN101141253 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101184099 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]CN101272247 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |