EP2739878 - MANUAL GEARBOX FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Getrag Ford Transmissions GmbH Scarletallee 2 50735 Köln / DE | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEGERATH, Andreas Eschenweg 5 50126 Bergheim / DE | [2014/24] | Application number, filing date | 12753403.0 | 27.07.2012 | [2017/47] | WO2012EP64784 | Priority number, date | DE20111052440 | 05.08.2011 Original published format: DE102011052440 | [2014/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013020836 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2739878 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2739878 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/097 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
F16H3/097 (EP,CN);
F16H2003/0822 (EP);
F16H2003/0826 (EP);
F16H2200/0026 (EP);
F16H2200/0052 (CN);
F16H2200/0056 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2014/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTGETRIEBE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2014/24] | English: | MANUAL GEARBOX FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2014/24] | French: | BOÎTE DE VITESSES POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2014/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 11.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5609062 (REYNOLDS JOSEPH D [US]) [X] 1-6,8-11,13 * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 21; figures 1-3 * [I] 12; | [XI]US4269077 (VANDERVOORT JOHN R) [X] 1-6,8-11,13 * the whole document * [I] 12; | [X]DE102005046899 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,11,12 * paragraphs [0016] - [0021]; figure 2 *; | [XI]DE2736834 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,13 * the whole document * [I] 12 | by applicant | DE19948811 |