01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
10.04.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
03.05.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.04.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.12.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
23.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
05.09.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.08.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
31.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.04.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.01.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.12.2017 |
First examination report |
|
14.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.09.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
17.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.04.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
25.04.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
13.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.02.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.02.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.02.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|