EP2747809 - REFILL MODULE FOR AN INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eli Lilly and Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOURT, Jesse, Arnold c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 02 /
DAVIS-WILSON, Jennifer, Ellen c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 03 /
YURCHENCO, James, R. c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/27] | Application number, filing date | 12753638.1 | 21.08.2012 | [2016/14] | WO2012US51702 | Priority number, date | US201161527718P | 26.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161527718 P | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013032779 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2747809 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2747809 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/20, A61M5/315, // A61M5/32 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
A61M5/2033 (EP,US);
A61M5/31513 (US);
A61M2005/206 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2073 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2474 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3247 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/27] | A61M5/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Extension states | BA | 15.01.2014 | ME | 15.01.2014 | Title | German: | NACHFÜLLMODUL FÜR INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/27] | English: | REFILL MODULE FOR AN INJECTION DEVICE | [2014/27] | French: | MODULE DE RECHARGE POUR UN DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 26.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.08.2012 | AL | 06.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | CZ | 06.04.2016 | DK | 06.04.2016 | EE | 06.04.2016 | HR | 06.04.2016 | LT | 06.04.2016 | LV | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | MK | 06.04.2016 | PL | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | RS | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SK | 06.04.2016 | SM | 06.04.2016 | IS | 06.08.2016 | PT | 08.08.2016 | LU | 21.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 21.08.2012 | |
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.08.2012 | |
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.08.2012 | |
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 06.04.2016 | |
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | HR | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | HR | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 06.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102004060146 (TECPHARMA LICENSING AG [CH]) [A] 1-7* figures 8-11 *; | [A]WO2009022132 (OWEN MUMFORD LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 6, lines 2-24; figures 5a, 5b * |