EP2751100 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING [3-[(6-CHLOR-3-PRIDINYL)METHYL]-2-THIAZOLIDINYLIDENE]CYANAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Str. 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUI, Norbert Am Geus Garten 2 51519 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
ANTONS, Stefan Schwalbenweg 3 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
HEINRICH, Jens-Dietmar Am Plattenbusch 6 51381 Leverkusen / DE | [2014/28] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2014/28] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12753705.8 | 27.08.2012 | [2015/42] | WO2012EP66602 | Priority number, date | EP20110179883 | 02.09.2011 Original published format: EP 11179883 | [2014/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013030152 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2751100 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2751100 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/04, C07D417/06 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
C07D417/06 (EP,CN,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/28] | C07D417/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON [3-[(6-CHLOR-3-PRIDINYL)METHYL]-2-THIAZOLIDINYLIDEN]CYANAMID | [2014/28] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING [3-[(6-CHLOR-3-PRIDINYL)METHYL]-2-THIAZOLIDINYLIDENE]CYANAMIDE | [2014/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE [3-[(6-CHLORO-3-PYRIDINYL)MÉTHYL]-2-THIAZOLIDINYLIDÈNE]-CYANAMIDE | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 04.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2012 | AL | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | HR | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | MK | 14.10.2015 | MT | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | RS | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | SM | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | NO | 14.01.2016 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 27.08.2012 | |
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 27.08.2012 | |
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.08.2012 | |
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.08.2012 | |
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 14.10.2015 | |
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 14.10.2015 | |
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 14.10.2015 | |
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 14.10.2015 | |
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 14.10.2015 | |
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | HR | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | HR | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 14.10.2015 | |
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 14.10.2015 | |
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 14.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1024140 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A] - JESCHKE, P. ET AL, "Thiacloprid (Bay YRC 2894) - a new member of the chloronicotinyl insecticide (CNI) family", PFLANZENSCHUTZ-NACHRICHTEN BAYER (ENGLISH EDITION), CODEN: PNBED6; ISSN: 0170-0405, (2001), vol. 54, no. 2, pages 147 - 160, XP002684766 [A] 1-4 * page 150 - page 152 * | by applicant | EP0235725 | EP1024140 |