Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2681668
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.03.2019 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
06.03.2019 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
22.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.02.2017 |
First examination report |
|
01.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.11.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
09.05.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
05.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.12.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
06.12.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
10.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|