EP2681127 - FRACTURABLE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sands Innovations Ltd Unit 2 42 Owen Creek Road Forest Glen, QLD 4556 / AU | [2017/11] |
Former [2014/02] | For all designated states Sands Innovations Pty Ltd. Level 3 74 Astor Terrace Brisbane, Queensland 4000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEYS, Bradley, Donald 8 Ocean Court Shelly Beach Caloundra, Queensland 4551 / AU | 02 /
STEVENS, David 36 Ridge Street Tewantin, Queensland 4565 / AU | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [2016/49] |
Former [2014/02] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12754762.8 | 06.02.2012 | [2016/49] | WO2012IB00205 | Priority number, date | US201113041131 | 04.03.2011 Original published format: US201113041131 | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012120344 | Date: | 13.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2681127 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2681127 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/36, B65D75/52 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
B65D75/366 (EP,US);
B65D77/20 (KR);
B65D77/30 (KR);
B65D2575/366 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRECHBARER BEHÄLTER | [2014/02] | English: | FRACTURABLE CONTAINER | [2014/02] | French: | CONTENANT FRACTURABLE | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 02.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MK | 07.12.2016 | RS | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | SM | 07.12.2016 | LU | 06.02.2017 | MT | 06.02.2017 | BG | 07.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/51] | CY | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
MT | 06.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
MT | 06.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
MT | 06.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | EE | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | EE | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | EE | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | EE | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 07.12.2016 | |
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3741384 (CLOUD C) [X] 1-4,6-14 * the whole document * [I] 5; | [A]FR2198461 (BOSCH VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 1* figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US4155454 (RYDEN JOHN V [US]) [X] 1-4,6-14 * column 3; figure 1, * [I] 5; | [XI]US5009894 (HSIAO CHARLES [US]) [X] 1-4,6-14 * figures 1,2 * [I] 5 | International search | [A]US7270239 (ROSS KAREN L [US]); | [A]US2010116772 (TEYS BRADLEY DONALD [AU]); | [A]US2011024462 (TEYS BRADLEY DONALD [AU], et al) | by applicant | US3741384 | US8091242 |