EP2681542 - NANOPORE DEVICE FOR REVERSIBLE ION AND MOLECULE SENSING OR MIGRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2019/51] |
Former [2014/02] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, California 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POURMAND, Nader 1156 High Street SOE 2 Santa Cruz, CA 95064 / US | 02 /
VILOZNY, Boaz 2050 Halterman Ave. a Santa Cruz, CA 95062 / US | 03 /
ACTIS, Paolo 1156 High Street BE 206 Santa Cruz, CA 95064 / US | 04 /
SEGER, R., Adam 1156 High Street BE 206 Santa Cruz, CA 95064 / US | 05 /
SINGARAM, Bakthan 183 Greystone Court Santa Cruz, CA 95062 / US | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Mark Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [2019/51] |
Former [2014/02] | Gibson, Mark Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12754878.2 | 02.03.2012 | [2019/51] | WO2012US27531 | Priority number, date | US201161449379P | 04.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161449379 P | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012122029 | Date: | 13.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2681542 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2681542 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26, G01N27/49, G01N35/00 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
B01L3/021 (EP,US);
G01N27/26 (KR);
G01N27/44791 (US);
B01L3/50273 (EP,US);
B82Y35/00 (US);
G01N27/3277 (US);
G01N27/4167 (US);
G01N27/49 (KR);
G01N33/48721 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NANOPORENVORRICHTUNG FÜR UMKEHRBARE IONEN- UND MOLEKÜLERKENNUNG ODER -MIGRATION | [2014/02] | English: | NANOPORE DEVICE FOR REVERSIBLE ION AND MOLECULE SENSING OR MIGRATION | [2014/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF À NANOPORES POUR UNE DÉTECTION OU MIGRATION RÉVERSIBLE D'IONS ET DE MOLÉCULES | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 11.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19216952.2 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 18.01.2020 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2012 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | ES | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | IT | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | NL | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | IE | 02.03.2020 | LU | 02.03.2020 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.03.2012 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 02.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 02.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 02.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 02.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 02.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2010072080 (KARHANEK MILOSLAV [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0056] * * figure 1 *; | [XD] - NIYA SA ET AL, "Reversible Cobalt Ion Binding to Imidazole-Modified Nanopipettes", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20101215), vol. 82, no. 24, doi:10.1021/ac102619j, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 9963 - 9966, XP055134163 [XD] 1-11 * page 9964, column lh, paragraph 4 - column rh, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac102619j | [X] - ZHANG L X ET AL, "Covalent modification of single glass conical nanopore channel with 6-carboxymethyl-chitosan for pH modulated ion current rectification", ELECTROCHEMISTRY COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 12, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.ELECOM.2010.06.031, ISSN 1388-2481, (20100901), pages 1249 - 1252, (20100628), XP027196033 [X] 1-11 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.elecom.2010.06.031 | [AD] - SENKEI UMEHARA ET AL, "-Lysine-Coated Quartz Nanopipettes", NANO LETTERS, (20061101), vol. 6, no. 11, doi:10.1021/nl061681k, ISSN 1530-6984, pages 2486 - 2492, XP055122497 [AD] 1-11 * page 2478, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl061681k | [A] - SHOJI E ET AL, "POTENTIOMETRIC SACCHARIDE DETECTION BASED ON THE PKA CHANGES OF POLY(ANILINE BORONIC ACID)", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, ACS PUBLICATIONS, US, (20020101), vol. 124, no. 42, doi:10.1021/JA0267371, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 12486 - 12493, XP001152436 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0267371 | International search | [A]US2010072080 (KARHANEK MILOSLAV [US], et al); | by applicant | US2008237063 | US2010072080 |