EP2684929 - AQUEOUS DISPERSION ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND ADHESIVE SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2014/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITANO, Chie c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-1-2 Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
OKADA, Mika c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-1-2 Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2014/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12754994.7 | 16.01.2012 | WO2012JP50714 | Priority number, date | JP20110052078 | 09.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011052078 | [2014/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012120921 | Date: | 13.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2684929 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09J133/06, B32B27/00, B32B27/30, C09J7/02, C09J11/06, C09J133/02, C09J133/04 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
C09J7/385 (EP,KR,US);
C09J133/06 (KR);
B32B27/00 (KR);
C09J11/06 (KR);
C09J133/02 (KR);
C09J7/22 (KR);
C09J7/30 (KR);
C08F220/1808 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/1804, C08F220/06 (EP,US);
C08F220/1808, C08F220/1804, C08F220/06, C08F220/06, C08F230/085 (KR,US,EP);
C08F220/1808, C08F220/1804, C08F220/06, C08F230/08 (EP);
C08F220/1808, C08F220/1804, C08F220/06, C08F230/08, C08F230/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAFTZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS EINER WÄSSRIGEN DISPERSION UND HAFTFOLIE DARAUS | [2014/03] | English: | AQUEOUS DISPERSION ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND ADHESIVE SHEET | [2014/03] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE EN DISPERSION AQUEUSE ET FEUILLE ADHÉSIVE | [2014/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2012 | Translation filed | 28.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2012 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 23.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63241084 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD); | [X]JPH05230428 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]JP2002265907 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP, et al); | [X]JP2003213244 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JP2004002525 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [A]JP2005170990 (NITTO DENKO CORP) | by applicant | JPS568476 | JP2010018689 | JP2011052078 | - JOURNAL OF THE ADHESION SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1986), vol. 22, no. 10, page 566 |