Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11998516 | ![]() | 04.06.2024 | B2 | US2012232159 | 13.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | US201213412571 | 05.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014507475 | ![]() | 27.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3682885 | ![]() | 22.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | EP12755254 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2829200 | ![]() | 03.05.2022 | C | CA2829200 | 13.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020203874B | ![]() | 09.09.2021 | B2 | AU2020203874 | 02.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2018204633 | 26.06.2018 | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | AU2016222412 | 31.08.2016 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | AU2020203874 | 11.06.2020 | AU2012225548 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018204633C | ![]() | 10.09.2020 | C1 | AU2018204633B | 12.03.2020 | B2 | AU2018204633 | 12.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2018204633 | 26.06.2018 | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | AU2016222412 | 31.08.2016 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | AU2012225548 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016222412B | ![]() | 29.03.2018 | B2 | AU2016222412 | 22.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | AU2016222412 | 31.08.2016 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | AU2012225548 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012225548B | ![]() | 02.06.2016 | B2 | AU2012225548 | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2683245 | ![]() | 07.12.2022 | B2 | EP2683245 | 25.12.2019 | B1 | EP2683245 | 27.08.2014 | A4 | EP2683245 | 15.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1122998T | 29.10.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2683245T | 09.01.2023 | T4 | DK2683245T | 24.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2773834T | 16.03.2023 | T5 | ES2773834T | 15.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20200142T | 17.02.2023 | T4 | HRP20200142T | 26.06.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | EP12755254 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2683245T | 25.03.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ614725 | 29.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ714294 | 30.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | NZ61472512 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2683245T | 20.03.2023 | T5 | PL2683245T | 05.10.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | EP12755254 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS60240 | 31.05.2023 | B2 | RS60240 | 30.06.2020 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | EP12755254 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2683245T | 28.04.2023 | T2 | SI2683245T | 31.07.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | EP12755254 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT202000083T | 08.05.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | WO2012US27926 | 06.03.2012 | EP12755254 | 06.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012122193 | ![]() | 13.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016053095 | ![]() | 14.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI2683245T | 13.01.2023 | T4 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE048596T | 28.08.2020 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2683245T | 21.02.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161449838 | 07.03.2011 | Type | ![]() | EP3682885 |