Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2751158
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.03.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
19.12.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.09.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.01.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.09.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.09.2015 |
First examination report |
|
12.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.11.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
11.10.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
06.06.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
04.04.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.02.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|