EP2753846 - DRIVE TRAIN HAVING A SPUR GEARING AND A CENTRIFUGAL PENDULUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2014/29] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSCH, Alain 10b, Rue de la division Leclerc F-67170 Brumath / FR | 02 /
LEHMANN, Steffen Zehntwiesenstrasse 31K 76275 Ettlingen / DE | 03 /
GERHARDT, Friiedrich Akazienstrasse 5 77694 Kehl-Leutesheim / DE | [2020/22] |
Former [2014/29] | 01 /
RUSCH, Alain 21b rue de la Gare F-67840 Klistett / FR | ||
02 /
LEHMANN, Steffen Zehntwiesenstrasse 31K 76275 Ettlingen / DE | |||
03 /
GERHARDT, Friiedrich Akazienstrasse 5 77694 Kehl-Leutesheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12756073.8 | 06.08.2012 | [2020/22] | WO2012DE00791 | Priority number, date | DE20111082388 | 09.09.2011 Original published format: DE102011082388 | [2014/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013034120 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2753846 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2753846 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/14, F16H57/00 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
F16F15/145 (EP,US);
F16F15/14 (US);
B60W10/06 (US);
B60W10/11 (US);
F16H57/0006 (EP,US);
F16H2057/0012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSTRANG MIT STIRNRADGETRIEBE UND FLIEHKRAFTPENDEL | [2014/29] | English: | DRIVE TRAIN HAVING A SPUR GEARING AND A CENTRIFUGAL PENDULUM | [2014/29] | French: | CHAÎNE CINÉMATIQUE À ENGRENAGE CYLINDRIQUE ET PENDULE CENTRIFUGE | [2014/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 27.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2012 | AL | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | DK | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | IT | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | MK | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | NL | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | RS | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | AT | 06.08.2020 | IE | 06.08.2020 | LU | 06.08.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | GB | 27.08.2020 | NO | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.08.2012 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
MT | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.08.2020 | ||
IE | 06.08.2020 | ||
LU | 06.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GB | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.08.2020 | ||
IE | 06.08.2020 | ||
LU | 06.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GB | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.08.2020 | ||
IE | 06.08.2020 | ||
LU | 06.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GB | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.08.2020 | ||
LU | 06.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GB | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.08.2020 | ||
LU | 06.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1780434 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1-9* figures 1-2 *; | [A]EP2108859 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102009023337 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0030] *; | [A]WO2010028620 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | Examination | US2007179012 | by applicant | DE102009042831 | DE102010018941 |