Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014356296 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP67481 | 07.09.2012 | EP11181837 | 19.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101973358B | Global Dossier | 29.04.2019 | B1 | KR20140072100 | 12.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP67481 | 07.09.2012 | EP11181837 | 19.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6396212B | Global Dossier | 26.09.2018 | B2 | JP2014526482 | 06.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP67481 | 07.09.2012 | EP11181837 | 19.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103814033B | Global Dossier | 13.07.2016 | B | CN103814033 | 21.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP67481 | 07.09.2012 | EP11181837 | 19.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2758404 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2019 | B1 | EP2758404 | 30.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12756714 | 07.09.2012 | WO2012EP67481 | 07.09.2012 | EP11181837 | 19.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014006482 | 19.03.2019 | B1 | BR112014006482 | 14.08.2018 | A8 | BR112014006482 | 16.05.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP67481 | 07.09.2012 | EP11181837 | 19.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2719262T | 09.07.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP67481 | 07.09.2012 | EP11181837 | 19.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN2755CHENP2014 | 04.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP67481 | 07.09.2012 | EP11181837 | 19.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013041388 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11181837 | 19.09.2011 |