EP2687426 - SUSPENSION FRAME STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Futaba Industrial Co. Ltd. 1, Aza-ochaya Hashime-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444-8558 / JP | [2017/29] |
Former [2017/08] | For all designated states Futaba Industrial Co. Ltd. 1 Aza-ochaya Hashime-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-8558 / JP | ||
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Futaba Industrial Co. Ltd. 1 Aza-ochaya Hashime-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-8558 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INAGAKI, Takashi c/o FUTABA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 1 Aza-ochaya Hashime-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-8558 / JP | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Carrie-Anne Louise, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2017/09] |
Former [2014/04] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12757153.7 | 13.03.2012 | [2017/09] | WO2012JP56417 | Priority number, date | JP20110058290 | 16.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011058290 | [2014/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012124692 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2687426 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2687426 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/11, B60G7/02 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
B60G7/02 (EP);
B62D21/11 (EP);
B60G2204/143 (EP);
B60G2204/15 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | B62D21/00, B60G7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFHÄNGUNGSRAHMENSTRUKTUR | [2014/04] | English: | SUSPENSION FRAME STRUCTURE | [2014/04] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CADRE DE SUSPENSION | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2013 | Translation filed | 15.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 02.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.03.2017 | AT | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | DK | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | ES | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | IT | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | MK | 01.03.2017 | NL | 01.03.2017 | PL | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | RS | 01.03.2017 | SE | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | SM | 01.03.2017 | TR | 01.03.2017 | IE | 13.03.2017 | LU | 13.03.2017 | MT | 13.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | FR | 02.05.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | GB | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | PT | 03.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
TR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
MT | 13.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
MT | 13.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
MT | 13.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
MT | 13.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
GB | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007278778 (TANAKA MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] *; | [X]DE202006020635U (KSM CASTINGS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4 * figure . * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022] * | International search | [X]JP2010137736 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [X]JPH06115457 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [Y]JPH0899650 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002127935 (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0459578U (MAZDA MOTOR CORP.); | [Y]JPS62112975U (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.); | [XP]JP2011126365 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2006281953 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2001106116 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) | Examination | DE102007012148 | by applicant | JP2008001307 |