EP2685870 - INCLINATION DEVICE FOR FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prösch, Jon Olav Kongsknektveien 22 7374 Röros / NO | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Curo AS Vestre Rosten 81 7075 Tiller / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Curo AS Industriveien 53 7080 Heimdal / NO | Application number, filing date | 12757975.3 | 14.03.2012 | WO2012NO50039 | Priority number, date | NO20110000387 | 14.03.2011 Original published format: NO 20110387 | [2014/04] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012125042 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2685870 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47C17/86, A47C19/04 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
A47C17/86 (EP);
A47C19/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | A47C17/86, A47C19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Title | German: | NEIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MÖBEL | [2014/04] | English: | INCLINATION DEVICE FOR FURNITURE | [2014/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INCLINAISON POUR MEUBLE | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 22.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 01.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2798053 (ONREV [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * page 4, line 23 - page 7, line 23; figures 1-4 *; | [X]NL9401725 (JOHANNES BERNARDUS HENDRIKUS J [NL]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * page 3, line 13 - page 5, line 29; figures 1-2 *; | [X]US6862762 (JOHNSON MICHAEL KARL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * column 3, line 44 - column 7, line 31; figures 1-8 *; | [X]JPS5566556U (-) [X] 1-3,5-10 * page 1 - page 4; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US644337 (SENG JULIUS T [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * page 1, line 58 - page 2, line 101; figures 1-8 *; | [X]JP2004229897 (FRANCE BED CO) [X] 1-6,9,10 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-6 * | International search | [X]EP2160961 (PESSOTTO RETI SAS DI PESSOTTO - (B1) PESSOTTO RETI SAS DI PESSOTTO G &); | [X]US1009442 (SCHWAB CHARLES M); | [X]US911980 (HERMANN CHARLES A ET AL); | [X]DE29814005U (RHEKER JOSEF) |