|
07.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.07.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
29.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.10.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
15.01.2014 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
15.01.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.12.2013 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
16.07.2013 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
36 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
45 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
39 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
2 |