01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
03.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
19.07.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
16.07.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.07.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.07.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.04.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.01.2019 |
Change - German title |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
11.01.2019 |
Change - French title |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
30.11.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.10.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
15.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.11.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.09.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2016 |
First examination report |
|
16.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.03.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
02.12.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.11.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
17.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
20.06.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
14.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.04.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|