EP2756652 - COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures Holding 81 LLC 7251 W Lake Mead Boulevard, Suite 300 Las Vegas, NV 89128 / US | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAKRZEWSKI, Robert 7 Queenshill Road Bristol BS4 2XL / GB | 02 /
HOWARD, Paul Anthony Tennyson Cottage Tennyson Road Horfield Bristol BS7 8SB / GB | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/30] | Application number, filing date | 12758885.3 | 10.09.2012 | WO2012GB52221 | Priority number, date | GB20110015748 | 12.09.2011 Original published format: GB 201115748 | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013038155 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2756652 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
H04W36/023 (EP,GB,US);
H04L67/568 (EP,GB,US);
H04W8/082 (EP);
G06F16/9574 (GB);
H04W36/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN | [2014/30] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL AND METHOD | [2014/30] | French: | TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 04.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 05.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2010057883 (CAO YANG [US], et al) |