EP2742041 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF BENZOHETERO [ 1, 3]- DIAZOLE COMPOUNDS DISUBSTITUTED WITH HETEOARYL GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale E. Mattei 1 00144 Rome / IT | [2015/43] |
Former [2014/25] | For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale E. Mattei 1 00144 Rome / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIMPERNA, Giuliana Piazzale Lombardia 11 I-28100 Novara / IT | 02 /
BIANCHI, Gabriele Via Biroli 1/B I-28100 Novara / IT | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Mauro, Marina Eliana, et al Murgitroyd & Company Piazza Borromeo, 12 20123 Milano / IT | [2014/32] |
Former [2014/25] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12759261.6 | 01.08.2012 | [2015/43] | WO2012IB53927 | Priority number, date | IT2011MI01516 | 08.08.2011 Original published format: IT MI20111516 | [2014/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013021315 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2742041 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2742041 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/14, C07D413/14, C07D417/14, C07D519/00 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIT HETEOARYLGRUPPEN DISUBSTITUIERTEN BENZOHETERO [1, 3] - DIAZOLVERBINDUNGEN | [2014/25] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF BENZOHETERO [ 1, 3]- DIAZOLE COMPOUNDS DISUBSTITUTED WITH HETEOARYL GROUPS | [2014/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSÉS BENZOHÉTÉRO[1,3]-DIAZOLE DISUBSTITUÉ PAR DES GROUPES HÉTÉROARYLE | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 05.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.08.2012 | AL | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MK | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | RS | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | SM | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X] - ZHOU HUAXING ET AL, "Donor-Acceptor Polymers Incorporating Alkylated Dithienylbenzothiadiazole for Bulk Heterojunction Solar Cells: Pronounced Effect of Positioning Alkyl Chains", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC; US, vol. 43, no. 2, doi:10.1021/MA902241B, ISSN 0024-9297, (20100226), pages 811 - 820, (20091229), XP008145880 [X] 1,4,5,11-13,23,24 * page 813 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma902241b | [A] - LI J C ET AL, "Synthesis of a benzothiadiazole/thiophene-based oligomer for bulk heterojunction photovoltaic cells", SYNTHETIC METALS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 159, no. 3-4, doi:10.1016/J.SYNTHMET.2008.08.016, ISSN 0379-6779, (20090201), pages 201 - 208, (20081016), XP025962474 [A] 1-24 * page 203 - page 204 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.synthmet.2008.08.016 | [A] - KITAMURA CHITOSHI ET AL, "Design of Narrow - Bandgap Polymers. Synthese and Properties of Monomers and Polymers Containing Aromatic - Donor and o-Quinoid-Acceptor Units", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (19960101), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.1021/CM950467M, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 570 - 578, XP002165567 [A] 1-24 * page 572 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm950467m | [A] - KIM ET AL., "A polymer gel electrolyte to achieve > 6% power conversion efficiency with a novel organic dye incorporating a low-band-gap chromophore", J. MATER. CHEM., (2008), vol. 18, pages 5223 - 5229, XP002665445 [A] 1-24 * page 5224 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B809376H | [AD] - TAMBA ET AL., "Palladium-catalyzed C-H functionalization of heteroarenes with aryl bromides and chlorides", J. ORG. CHEM., (2010), vol. 75, pages 6998 - 7001, XP002665446 [AD] 1-24 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JO101433G | [A] - STEINBERGER ET AL., "A-D-A-D-A-Type oligothiophenes for vacuum-deposited organic solar cells", ORGANIC LETTERS, (20110107), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 90 - 93, XP002665447 [A] 1-24 * page 91 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol102603n | [A] - PRICE ET AL., "Fluorine substituted conjugated polymer of medium band gap yields 7% efficiency in polymer - Fullerene solar cells", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (20110330), vol. 133, pages 4625 - 4631, XP002665448 [A] 1-24 * page 4626 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA1112595 | by applicant | WO2007081991 | ITMI20101316 | - "Organic Photovoltaics: Mechanism, Materials and Devices", 2005 | - KITAMURA ET AL., CHEMISTRY OF MATERIAL, vol. 8, 1996, pages 570 - 578 | - KIM ET AL., JOURNAL OF MATERIAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 18, 2008, pages 5223 - 5229 | - TAMBA ET AL., JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 75, 2010, pages 6998 - 7001 | - ROGER ET AL., GREEN CHEMISTRY, vol. 11, 2009, pages 425 - 432 | - CHEN ET AL., CHEMICAL COMMUNICATION, 2010 | - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 7, no. 3, 1970, pages 629 - 633 | IT2009MI01796 |