Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9050576 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2015 | B2 | US2015064101 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | WO2012EP68391 | 19.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2849619 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2016 | C | CA2849619 | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | WO2012EP68391 | 19.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012311625B | Global Dossier | 16.06.2016 | B2 | AU2012311625 | 06.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | WO2012EP68391 | 19.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2758162 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2018 | B1 | EP2758162 | 30.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | WO2012EP68391 | 19.09.2012 | EP12759472 | 19.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AP3897 | 16.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | WO2012EP68391 | 19.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014006097 | 11.04.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | WO2012EP68391 | 19.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1120214T | 12.12.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | WO2012EP68391 | 19.09.2012 | EP12759472 | 19.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2658156T | 08.03.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | WO2012EP68391 | 19.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2758162T | 30.05.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | WO2012EP68391 | 19.09.2012 | EP12759472 | 19.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2564333 | 27.09.2015 | C1 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | WO2012EP68391 | 19.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201402065 | 30.09.2015 | B | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | WO2012EP68391 | 19.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013041546 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2572781 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR088223 | 21.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2014000680 | 23.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2014000702 | 05.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO6920286 | 10.04.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE036723T | 30.07.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20141331 | 19.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2758162T | 29.01.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | EP11182103 | 21.09.2011 |